Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970614

EP0970614 - A cereal-based food, particularly for human consumption [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.04.2004
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.06.2004  [2004/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SRAUM di Ezio Bartocci e C. S.a.s.
Via L. Da Vinci, 32
29100 Piacenza / IT
[2003/24]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Sraum di Ezio Bartocci & C. S.a.s.
Via L. Da Vinci, 32
29100 Piacenza / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Bartocci, Ezio, c/o Sraum Ezio Bartocci & C. S.a.s
Via L. Da Vinci, 32
29100 Piacenza / IT
02 / De Luigi, Mario, c/o Sraum Ezio Bartocci & C. S.a.s
Via L. Da Vinci, 32
29100 Piacenza / IT
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Siniscalco, Fabio , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8
20121 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2002/16]Siniscalco, Fabio , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8
20121 Milano / IT
Former [2000/35]Perani, Aurelio , et al
Jacobacci & Perani, Via Senato, 8
20121 Milano / IT
Former [2000/02]Ferreccio, Rinaldo , et al
Jacobacci & Perani S.p.A., Via Visconti di Modrone 7
20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date98830382.224.06.1998
[2000/02]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970614
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970614
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:A23C11/02, A23C21/02, A23C21/08
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/38]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Lebensmittel basierend auf Cerealien, insbesondere für die menschliche Ernährung[2003/02]
English:A cereal-based food, particularly for human consumption[2000/02]
French:Produits alimentaires à base de céréales propre à la consommation humaine[2000/02]
Former [2000/02]Lebensmittel basierend auf Cerealien, insbesonders für die menschliche Ernährung
Examination procedure19.03.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
19.03.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
18.02.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.02.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
19.06.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
01.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.12.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT
24.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.01.2003Fee for grant paid
27.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
17.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
25.09.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
25.09.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
25.09.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
25.09.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
25.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
25.09.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
25.09.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH11.06.2003
LI11.06.2003
SE11.09.2003
[2004/10]
Former [2004/01]CH11.06.2003
LI11.06.2003
Documents cited:Search[XY]GB2092878  (CHIBUKU BREWERIES LTD) [X] 1-3,9,17 * page 1, line 34 - line 44 * * page 1, line 64 - line 75; examples 1-3 * [Y] 1-20;
 [X]SU1255091  ;
 [X]WO9503706  (IMMUNOPATH PROFILE INC ;GIRSH LEONARD S (US)) [X] 1-3,9 * examples 10,10A,10B *;
 [X]US5328710  (SAGE JOYCE G ET AL) [X] 13,15 * column 6, line 44 - column 7, line 55 *;
 [Y]US5112812  (SAMUELSSON ERNST-GUNNAR ET AL) [Y] 1-20 * column 1, line 39 - line 54 *;
 [X]WO9014101  (AEK DEV CORP) [X] 1-20 * page 12, line 3 - line 8 *;
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 17, Database accession no. 87-120933, XP002088967 & SU1255091 A 19860907 (STAVROPOL POLY) [X] 1-3 * abstract *
 [X]  - KEIKO SHIRAI ET AL., "Production of Yoghurt-like Product from Plant Foodstuffs and Whey. Substrate Preparation and Fermentation", JOURNAL OF THE SCIENCE OF FOOD AND AGRICULTURE, vol. 59, no. 2, pages 199 - 204, XP000292149 [X] 1,13 * tables 1,2 *
 [Y]  - QUICK FROZEN FOODS INTERNATIONAL, (1981), vol. 23, no. 1, pages 159 - 160, XP002088966 [Y] 1-20
    [ ] - FSTA, INTERNATIONAL FOOD INFORMATION SERVICE (IFIS), FRANFURT/MAIN, DE [ ] * abstract *