Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969507

EP0969507 - EEPROM memory cell manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/01]EEPROM memory cell and corresponding manufacturing method
[2006/06]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.09.2007
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STMicroelectronics Srl
Via C. Olivetti, 2
20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
STMicroelectronics S.r.l.
Via C. Olivetti, 2
20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Pio, Federico
Via Volturno Fontana, 80
20047 Brugherio (Milano) / IT
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Botti, Mario
Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Cappellini, 11
20124 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Botti, Mario
Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Locatelli, 5
20124 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date98830390.530.06.1998
[2000/01]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969507
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969507
Date:15.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/8247, H01L27/115, H01L21/336
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/37]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung einer EEPROM-Speicherzelle[2006/06]
English:EEPROM memory cell manufacturing method[2006/06]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'une cellule de mémoire EEPROM[2006/06]
Former [2000/01]EEPROM-Speicherzelle und deren Herstellungsverfahren
Former [2000/01]EEPROM memory cell and corresponding manufacturing method
Former [2000/01]Cellule de mémoire EEPROM et procédé de fabrication
Examination procedure13.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/19]
17.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2006Fee for grant paid
27.09.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.08.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
25.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
27.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
27.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDE16.02.2007
[2008/15]
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5326999  (KIM KEON-SOO ET AL) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [A] 5,6,9;
 [X]JPH021176  ;
 [A]EP0752721  (SHARP KK) [A] 7 * page 12, line 56 - page 15, line 51; figures 19-38 *;
 [A]US4814854  (HOLLOWAY THOMAS C ET AL) [A] 3,4,8,9 * column 9, line 44 - column 10, line 13; figures 1A-2B *;
 [A]EP0366423  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP) [A] 1,2,5-7,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0655785  (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO ;TOSHIBA MICRO ELECTRONICS (JP)) [A] 1,2,5-7,10 * page 2, column 1, line 10 - page 4, column 6, line 48; figures 1-6 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900313), vol. 014, no. 133, Database accession no. (E - 0902), & JP02001176 A 19900105 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 5,6,10 * abstract *