Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973109

EP0973109 - Method for automatically sequencing the processing of work batches of a manufacturing department [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.07.2009
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.07.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.08.2009  [2009/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STMicroelectronics Srl
Via C. Olivetti, 2
20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
STMicroelectronics S.r.l.
Via C. Olivetti, 2
20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Gandolfi, Luciano
Via Parini, 26
20094 Corsico / IT
02 / Micheletti, Armando
Viale Monza, 355
20126 Milan / IT
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2005/44]Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Dr. Modiano & Associati S.p.A. Via Meravigli 16
20123 Milano / IT
Former [2000/03]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date98830433.315.07.1998
[2000/03]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973109
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/39]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum automatischen Aneinanderreihen der Verarbeitung von Arbeitsablauf-Sätzen einer Herstellungsabteilung[2000/03]
English:Method for automatically sequencing the processing of work batches of a manufacturing department[2000/03]
French:Procédé pour la mise en séquence automatique du traitement des lots d'articles d'un département de fabrication[2000/03]
Examination procedure29.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/34]
03.02.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/32]
10.03.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2009/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
29.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
28.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
28.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
27.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
26.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
31.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200811   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5651098  (INOUE HARUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 22 - line 63 * * column 8, line 31 - column 9, line 7 * * figures 12,27 *;
 [A]JPH08315028  ;
 [XY]  - TAMAKI H ET AL, "Genetics-based machine learning approach to production scheduling-a case of in-tree type precedence relation", IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS. PROCEEDINGS. ISIE'98 (CAT. NO.98TH8357), IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS. PROCEEDINGS. ISIE'98, PRETORIA, SOUTH AFRICA, 7-10 JULY 1998, ISBN 0-7803-4756-0, 1998, New York, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, pages 714 - 719 vol.2, XP002090759 [X] 1-5,7,8 * page 714, column 1, line 39 - page 715, column 1, line 12 * * page 715, column 2, line 17 - line 39 * * page 716, column 2, line 14 - line 39 * [Y] 6
 [Y]  - JONES A ET AL, "Development of a predictive-reactive scheduler using generic algorithms and simulation-based scheduling software for "generic" read "genetic"", ADVANCED MANUFACTURING PROCESSES, SYSTEMS, AND TECHNOLOGIES (AMPST 96), PROCEEDINGS OF 1ST INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON ADVANCED MANUFACTURING PROCESSES, SYSTEMS AND TECHNOLOGIES, BRADFORD, UK, 26-27 MARCH 1996, ISBN 0-85298-989-X, 1996, Bury St Edmunds, UK, Mech. Eng. Publications, UK, pages 589 - 598, XP002090760 [Y] 6 * page 594, line 1 - line 12 *
 [A]  - YAMADA T ET AL, "Solving the C/sub sum/ permutation flowshop scheduling problem by genetic local search", 1998 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON EVOLUTIONARY COMPUTATION PROCEEDINGS. IEEE WORLD CONGRESS ON COMPUTATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (CAT. NO.98TH8360), 1998 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON EVOLUTIONARY COMPUTATION PROCEEDINGS. IEEE WORLD CONGRESS ON COMPU, ISBN 0-7803-4869-9, 1998, New York, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, pages 230 - 234, XP002090761 [A] 1-8 * page 232, column 1, line 22 - page 233, column 1, line 17 * * figures 3,4 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 097, no. 003, [A] 1-8 * abstract *
 [A]  - SANNOMIYA N ET AL, "Application of genetic algorithm to scheduling problems in manufacturing processes", PROCEEDINGS OF 1996 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON EVOLUTIONARY COMPUTATION (ICEC'96) (CAT. NO.96TH8114), PROCEEDINGS OF IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON EVOLUTIONARY COMPUTATION, NAGOYA, JAPAN, 20-22 MAY 1996, ISBN 0-7803-2902-3, 1996, New York, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, pages 523 - 528, XP002090762 [A] 1-8 * page 524, column 1, line 26 - page 526, column 1, line 21 *
 [DA]  - SYSWERDA G, "Uniform crossover in Genetic Algorithms", PROCEEDINGS OF THE THIRD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON GENTIC ALGORITHMS, George Mason University, (19890604), pages 2 - 9, XP002090763 [DA] 3 * page 1, column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 31 *