Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975086

EP0975086 - Integrated device comprising a semiconductor material microactuator, in particular for a hard disc read/write head [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.07.2006
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 31.12.2008  [2009/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STMicroelectronics Srl
Via C. Olivetti, 2
20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
STMicroelectronics S.r.l.
Via C. Olivetti, 2
20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Cini, Dario
Via Aristotele, 15/1
20010 Cornaredo / IT
02 / Vigna, Benedetto
Via Anzio, 20
85100 Potenza / IT
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Cerbaro, Elena , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Cerbaro, Elena, Dr. , et al
STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date98830447.322.07.1998
[2000/04]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975086
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0975086
Date:21.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:H02N1/00, G11B21/02
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/40]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Integrierte Anordnung mit einem Halbleiter-Microantrieb, insbesondere für einen Lese-/Schreibkopf für harte Speicherplatten[2000/04]
English:Integrated device comprising a semiconductor material microactuator, in particular for a hard disc read/write head[2000/04]
French:Dispositif intégré comprenant un microactionneur a semi-conducteur notamment pour un tête de lecture/écriture pour disque dur[2000/04]
Examination procedure20.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/40]
16.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.09.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
29.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.05.2005Fee for grant paid
13.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/35]
Request for further processing for:29.11.2004Request for further processing filed
29.11.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.12.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
29.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
28.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
28.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
27.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR21.09.2005
DE22.12.2005
[2009/01]
Former [2006/36]DE22.12.2005
Documents cited:Search[XDA]US5025346  (TANG WILLIAM C [US], et al) [XD] 1 * column 3, line 38 - line 52 * * column 6, line 3 - line 16; figure - * [A] 2-4;
 [XA]  TANG W C ET AL, "LATERALLY DRIVEN POLYSILICON RESONANT MICROSTRUCTURES", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS, (19891115), vol. 20, no. 1 / 02, pages 25 - 32, XP000135244 [X] 1 * page 26, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 29, column R, paragraph 4 - page 30, column L, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 * [A] 2-4

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0250-6874(89)87098-2
 [AD]  FAN L -S ET AL, "MAGNETIC RECORDING HEAD POSITIONING AT VERY HIGH TRACK DENSITIES USING A MICROACTUATOR-BASED, TWO-STAGE SERVO SYSTEM", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, (199506), vol. 42, no. 3, pages 222 - 233, XP000506382 [AD] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/41.382132