Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990993

EP0990993 - Event counter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.06.2003
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.08.2003  [2003/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BULL S.A.
68, route de Versailles
78434 Louveciennes Cedex / FR
[2000/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Majo, Tommaso
Via Trieste, 21/E
20010 Santo Stefano Ticino (Milano) / IT
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Pezzoli, Ennio , et al
Jacobacci & Perani S.p.A.
Via Senato 8
20121 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Pezzoli, Ennio , et al
Jacobacci & Perani S.p.A. Via Senato, 8
20121 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date98830458.028.07.1998
[2000/14]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990993
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/18
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/50]
Former [2000/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ereigniszähler[2000/14]
English:Event counter[2000/14]
French:Compteur d'évènements[2000/14]
Examination procedure02.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/14]
06.10.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
08.01.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
01.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/33]
10.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
31.10.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
31.10.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
31.10.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
31.10.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
31.10.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
31.10.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
31.10.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
31.10.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
31.10.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
31.10.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
31.10.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
31.10.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
31.10.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
31.10.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5181374  (AEPPLI KURT [CH]) [A] 1,10 * column 3, line 32 - line 39; claim 3 *;
 [A]US4054782  (WEIBEL EWALD RUDOLPH) [A] 1,10 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0205122  (TEKTRONIX INC [US])