Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993785

EP0993785 - Last support for preassembly machines [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.05.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 07.07.2004  [2004/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OFFICINE MECCANICHE MOLINA & BIANCHI S.p.A.
Viale Industria, 213/5
27029 Vigevano (Pavia) / IT
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Molina, Giuseppe
Via Gorizia 27
27029 Vigevano - Pavia / IT
02 / Bianchi, Carlo
Via Vecchia di Vigevano 6
27025 Gambolo' - Pavia / IT
 [2003/22]
Former [2000/16]01 / Molina, Guiseppe
Via Gorizia 27
27029 Vigevano - Pavia / IT
02 / Bianchi, carlo
Via Vecchia di Vigevano 6
27025 Gambolo' - Pavia / IT
Representative(s)Perani, Aurelio , et al
Perani & Partners Piazza San Babila, 5
20122 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2001/50]Perani, Aurelio , et al
Perani Mezzanotte & Partners Piazza San Babila 5
20122 Milano / IT
Former [2000/16]Siniscalco, Fabio , et al
c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Via Senato, 8
20121 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date98830548.821.09.1998
[2000/16]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993785
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993785
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:A43D25/20, A43D23/02
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   PT [2000/52]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Leistenstütze für Montagemaschinen[2000/16]
English:Last support for preassembly machines[2000/16]
French:Support de forme pour machines d'assemblage préalable[2000/16]
Examination procedure14.04.1999Examination requested  [2000/16]
20.10.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
22.02.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, FI, IE, LU, MC, NL, SE
08.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.04.2003Fee for grant paid
04.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
30.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
30.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
30.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
30.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
30.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
30.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
30.11.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
30.11.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.06.2003
BE04.06.2003
CH04.06.2003
LI04.06.2003
[2004/28]
Former [2004/03]AT04.06.2003
CH04.06.2003
LI04.06.2003
Former [2004/01]CH04.06.2003
LI04.06.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]DE1942047  (EUGEN G HENKEL MASCHINENFABRIK) [A] 1 * page 15, paragraph 3; figure 2 *;
 [A]US2694131  (CARSON GORDON B) [A] 1 * column 2, line 46 - line 60; figure - *;
 [A]US1951374  (PYM CHARLES F) [A] 1 * page 1, line 26 - line 28; figure - *;
 [A]US3271799  (HUBBARD ARTHUR R) [A] 1 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 17; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]WO9208385  (CARTER FOOTWEAR INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 11, line 20 - page 13, line 10; figure - *;
 [A]US5714098  (POTTER DANIEL R [US]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 50 - column 8, line 42; figures 9,10 *