Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993793

EP0993793 - Side guide structure for the drawers of a drawer unit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.06.2001
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.06.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.07.2001 [2001/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mobilever S.p.a.
Corso Vinzaglio, 12 bis
10121 Torino / IT
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Ruffino, Antonio
Corso Stati Uniti, 134
I-10059 Susa, Torino / IT
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Cian, Paolo , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A.
Corso Regio Parco 27
10152 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]Cian, Paolo , et al
Jacobacci & Perani S.p.A. Corso Reggio Parco 27
10152 Torino / IT
Former [2000/16]Saconney, Piero , et al
c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27
10152 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date98830596.712.10.1998
[2000/16]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993793
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:A47B67/04, A47B88/04
[2000/16]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/52]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Seitenführungsstruktur für Schubladen[2000/16]
English:Side guide structure for the drawers of a drawer unit[2000/16]
French:Structure des guides lateraux pour tiroirs[2000/16]
Examination procedure20.10.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/30]
02.02.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/30]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
23.11.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
23.11.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE4406817  (BEISWENGER FLASCHNEREI GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 20 - line 50; figures 1,7 * * column 6, line 25 - line 51 * [A] 5;
 [X]FR2162983  (CHAMPION PAPER CO LTD) [X] 1 * page 2, line 31 - page 4, line 14; figures 1-4 *;
 [XA]US4634193  (LIU MIKE [TW]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 29 - line 44 * [A] 7;
 [A]FR2124930  (ESCOLANO SERRANO ANTONIO, et al) [A] 1,3,4,6,12 * figures 1-4; claim 1 *;
 [A]US2704699  (JACK EVANS) [A] 1,7-9 * column 3, paragraph 3 - paragraph L; figures 1,2,8-10 *