Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1005233

EP1005233 - Constant bit-rate coding control in a video coder by way of pre-analysis of the slices of the pictures [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  15.06.2007
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2007Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 18.07.2007  [2007/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STMicroelectronics Srl
Via C. Olivetti, 2
20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
STMicroelectronics S.r.l.
Via C. Olivetti, 2
20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Bagni, Daniele
Via Promessi Sposi, 4
23887 Olgiate Molgora / IT
02 / De Bei, Mattia
Via Altera, 12
30019 Sottomarina / IT
03 / Mian, Gian Antonio
Via Digione, 20
35100 Padova / IT
04 / Sacchi, Maria Luisa
Via Baldissera, 2/A
20129 Milano / IT
[2000/22]
Representative(s)Pellegri, Alberto , et al
Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci, 8
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]Pellegri, Alberto , et al
c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza Repubblica, 5
21100 Varese / IT
Application number, filing date98830599.112.10.1998
[2000/22]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1005233
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/50
[2000/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/06]
Former [2000/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Steuerung zur konstanten Bitratencodierung in einem Videocodierer durch Preanalyse der Bilder in Sliceeinheiten[2000/22]
English:Constant bit-rate coding control in a video coder by way of pre-analysis of the slices of the pictures[2000/22]
French:Contrôle de codage à débit constant dans un codeur vidéo par une préanalyse des tranches d'images[2000/22]
Examination procedure29.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/30]
01.12.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
06.03.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
20.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.06.2007Application withdrawn by applicant  [2007/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
27.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
26.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
28.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
27.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
27.12.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5721589  (MURATA ERI [JP]) [A] 1-4 * column 1, line 19 - column 2, line 23 *;
 [A]EP0705041  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4 * page 6, line 35 - page 6, line 38 *
 [Y]  BAGNI D ET AL, Efficient intra-frame encoding and improved rate control in H.263 compatible format, ISSN 0341-0196, ITG-FACHBERICHTE, 1997, VDE-VERLAG, GERMANY, PAGE(S) 767 - 774, PICTURE CODING SYMPOSIUM. PCS 97, BERLIN, GERMANY, 10-12 SEPT. 1997, XP002095679 [Y] 1-4 * section "3.2 Rate Control with pre-analysis" *
 [DY]  KEESMAN G ET AL, "BIT-RATE CONTROL FOR MPEG ENCODERS", SIGNAL PROCESSING. IMAGE COMMUNICATION, (19950201), vol. 6, no. 6, pages 545 - 560, XP000491860 [DY] 1-4 * page 548, column L, line 6 - page 556, column R, line 14 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0923-5965(94)00038-K