Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0997123

EP0997123 - Method and device for applying laminar elements onto a substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.09.2001
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.10.2001 [2001/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fameccanica. Data S.p.A.
Via Italica 101
65127 Pescara / IT
[2000/18]
Inventor(s)01 / Pasqualoni, Paolo
Via Sgarrone, 2
66020 Sambuceto di san Giovanni Teatino / IT
[2000/18]
Representative(s)Bosotti, Luciano , et al
C/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A.
Corso Regio Parco, 27
10152 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]Bosotti, Luciano , et al
c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27
10152 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date98830659.330.10.1998
[2000/18]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0997123
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/15
[2000/18]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/02]
Former [2000/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Anbringen von laminierten Elementen auf eine Unterlage[2000/18]
English:Method and device for applying laminar elements onto a substrate[2000/18]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour l'application des éléments stratifiés sur un substrat[2000/18]
Examination procedure04.11.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/44]
21.03.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/44]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
21.12.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]US3728191  (WIERZBA A, et al) [X] 1-26 * abstract * * column 2, line 1 - line 11 * * column 2, line 27 - line 55 * * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 5 * * column 4, line 36 - line 57 * * column 4, line 73 - column 5, line 15; figure -; claim - * [A] 27-32;
 [DXA]US5603794  (THOMAS SUZANNE M [US]) [DX] 27,29 * abstract * [A] 28,30-32;
 [A]US5423789  (KUEN DAVID A [US]);
 [A]EP0355292  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]);
 [A]US4025373  (HIRSCH JOHN L, et al);
 [DA]US4209016  (SCHAAR CHARLES H [US])