Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0999514

EP0999514 - Device for the acquisition and automatic processing of data obtained from optical codes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/19]Device and method for the acquisition and automatic processing of data obtained from optical codes
[2006/01]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.04.2007
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DATALOGIC S.P.A.
Via Candini 2 40012 Lippo di Calderara di Reno
(Bologna) / IT
[2006/24]
Former [2000/19]For all designated states
DATALOGIC S.P.A.
Via Candini 2
I-40012 Lippo di Calderara di Reno (Bologna) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Canini, Federico
Via Cavalcanti, 3
40069 Zola Predosa / IT
02 / Piva, Marco
Via Serra di Sopra, 25
61010 Pennabilli / IT
03 / Zocca, Rinaldo
Via Don Giovanni Verità, 10
40129 Bologna / IT
[2000/19]
Representative(s)Checcacci, Giorgio , et al
Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A.
Via Trebbia 20
20135 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2001/17]Checcacci, Giorgio , et al
Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Viale Sabotino 19/2
20135 Milano / IT
Former [2000/19]Cerbaro, Elena, Dr. , et al
STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date98830665.002.11.1998
[2000/19]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0999514
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0999514
Date:14.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06K7/10
[2000/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/03]
Former [2000/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Anordnung zur automatischen Erfassung und Verarbeitung von optischen Codes[2006/01]
English:Device for the acquisition and automatic processing of data obtained from optical codes[2006/01]
French:Dispositif pour l'acquisition et le traitement automatique de codes optiques[2006/01]
Former [2000/19]Anordnung und Verfahren zur automatischen Erfassung und Verarbeitung von optischen Koden
Former [2000/19]Device and method for the acquisition and automatic processing of data obtained from optical codes
Former [2000/19]Procédé et dispositif pour l'acquisition et le traitement automatique de codes optiques
Examination procedure12.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/51]
06.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.06.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
09.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.2005Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.12.2005
15.11.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
30.11.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.12.2005Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
04.04.2006Fee for grant paid
04.04.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP05013873.4  / EP1650692
EP06012087.0  / EP1715439
Opposition(s)15.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21]
Request for further processing for:09.08.2004Request for further processing filed
09.08.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.08.2004Decision despatched
31.03.2003Request for further processing filed
31.03.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.04.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
17.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
09.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
29.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
28.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200306   M06   Fee paid on   09.01.2004
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
[2007/22]
Former [2007/21]AT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
SE14.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
Former [2007/17]AT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
SE14.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
Former [2007/03]AT14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
SE14.09.2006
Former [2007/01]AT14.06.2006
SE14.09.2006
Former [2006/49]SE14.09.2006
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9708647  (PSC INC [US]) [X] 1-4,9-11,18,24,29-39 * abstract * * page 5, line 15 - line 29; figure 1 * * page 11, line 1 - line 22; figures 2-5 * * page 12, line 33 - page 13, line 2 * [Y] 5-8,12-17,19;
 [Y]US5521366  (WANG YNJIUN P [US], et al) [Y] 5-8,12-17,19 * figures 1B-C,2 * * column 11, line 65 - column 12, line 7 * * column 4, line 20 - line 48 * * column 8, line 33 - line 43 *;
 [XA]US5262871  (WILDER JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6,16,20-22,24-27 * abstract * * column 2, line 34 - line 43 * * column 5, line 27 - line 29 * * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 64 * * column 11, line 19 - line 61 * [A] 23,28;
 [A]US5756981  (ROUSTAEI ALEXANDER R [US], et al) [A] 8 * abstract * * column 58, line 56 - line 59 *;
 [A]  - FOSSUM E R, "CMOS active pixel image sensors", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH, SECTION - A: ACCELERATORS, SPECTROMETERS, DETECTORS AND ASSOCIATED EQUIPMENT, (19970821), vol. 395, no. 3, page 291-297, XP004088247 [A] 1,6,29,39 * page 292; figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-9002(97)00812-7