Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1001297

EP1001297 - Optical device and method for focusing a laser beam [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.08.2009Change - representativepublished on 16.09.2009  [2009/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DATALOGIC S.P.A.
Via Candini 2 40012 Lippo di Calderara di Reno
(Bologna) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/20]For all designated states
DATALOGIC S.P.A.
Via Candini 2
I-40012 Lippo di Calderara di Reno (Bologna) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Oliva, Guido Maurizio
C. so del Popolo, 427
45100 Rovigo / IT
[2000/20]
Representative(s)Checcacci, Giorgio
Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A.
Via Trebbia 20
20135 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2009/38]Checcacci, Giorgio
Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Via Trebbia 20
20135 Milano / IT
Former [2000/20]Checcacci, Giorgio
PORTA, CHECCACCI & Associati S.p.A. Viale Sabotino, 19/2
20135 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date98830676.710.11.1998
[2000/20]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1001297
Date:17.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:G02B27/09
[2000/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/09]
Former [2001/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  LI 
Former [2000/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Optische Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Fokussieren eines Laserstrahls[2000/20]
English:Optical device and method for focusing a laser beam[2000/20]
French:Dispositif optique et procédé de focalisation d'un faisceau laser[2000/20]
Examination procedure22.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/33]
31.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/38]
11.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
17.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US5572367  (JUNG JIN HO [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,9,10,12-14 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0310711  (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,9,10,14 * column 7, line 20 - column 8, line 35; figures 3A,4A *;
 [X]EP0312652  (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,9,10,14 * column 10, line 12 - column 11, line 37; figures 6A,7A,8A *;
 [X]US5373395  (ADACHI YOSHI [US]) [X] 1,3,4,14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5742038  (DVORKIS PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1,5,14 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0752680  (SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1,5,6,11,14 * page 7, line 52 - page 8, line 30; figures 8-10 *;
 [X]DE4218795  (KRUPP AG [DE]) [X] 1,7,8 * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 3; figure 1 * * column 3, line 22 - line 40 *;
 [X]US5790576  (WAARTS ROBERT G [US], et al) [X] 1,9,10,12-14 * column 4, line 59 - column 5, line 62; figures 1-4 *;
 [XA]US5237451  (SAXE STEVEN G [US]) [X] 1-4,9,10,12,14 * column 3, line 17 - line 50; figures 3,4 * [A] 7,8