Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969522

EP0969522 - A thin-film opto-electronic device and a method of making it [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.03.2001 [2001/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INTERUNIVERSITAIR MICROELEKTRONICA CENTRUM VZW
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
INTERUNIVERSITAIR MICROELEKTRONICA CENTRUM VZW
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
Inventor(s)01 / STALMANS Lieven
Egstraat 46
3920 Lommel / BE
02 / POORTMANS Jef
Overwinningstraat 51
3010 Leuven / BE
03 / CAYMAX Matty
Groenveldstraat 46
3001Leuven / BE
04 / NIJS Johan
Slotgracht 4
3210 Linden-Lubbeek / BE
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Van Malderen, Michel , et al
pronovem - Office Van Malderen Avenue Josse Goffin 158
1082 Bruxelles / BE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Van Malderen, Michel , et al
Office van Malderen Place Reine Fabiola 6/1
1083 Bruxelles / BE
Application number, filing date98870147.003.07.1998
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969522
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP29.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:H01L31/052
[2000/01]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/37]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Optoelektronisches Dünnfilm-Bauelement und dessen Herstellung[2000/01]
English:A thin-film opto-electronic device and a method of making it[2000/01]
French:Dispositif optoélectronique à couche mince et son procédé de fabrication[2000/01]
Examination procedure06.07.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/13]
27.10.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/13]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
22.08.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
22.08.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH03235371  ;
 [X]DE4319413  (FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JUELICH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6,10-14,17 * column 2, line 10 - column 3, line 40; figure 3; claims 3,5,11 *;
 [A]US4806996  (LURYI SERGEY [US]) [A] 1-17 * column 2, line 27 - column 5, line 15; figure 5 *;
 [A]JPH0342818  ;
 [A]US5136351  (INOUE YASUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 7, line 57 - column 8, line 39; figures 11,12 *;
 [A]JPH06163968  ;
 [A]JPS63182811  ;
 [A]US5397429  (HUMMEL ROLF E [US], et al) [A] 12 * abstract *;
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920114), vol. 016, no. 014, Database accession no. (E - 1154), [X] 1-6,10-14,17 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910508), vol. 015, no. 179, Database accession no. (E - 1064), [A] 1-17 * abstract *
 [A]  - VERNON S M ET AL, "HIGH PERFORMANCE POROUS SILICON SOLAR CELL DEVELOPMENT", WORLD CONFERENCE ON PHOTOVOLTAIC ENERGY, WAIKOLOA, DEC. 5 - 9, 1994, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19941205), vol. 2, no. CONF. 1, pages 1583 - 1586, XP000680126 [A] 1-17

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WCPEC.1994.520518
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940908), vol. 018, no. 480, Database accession no. (E - 1603), [A] 1-17 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881130), vol. 012, no. 457, Database accession no. (E - 688), [A] 1-17 * abstract *
 [A]  - GRIGORAS K ET AL, "Enhanced light absorption in anodically etched silicon wafers", THIN SOLID FILMS, (19960415), vol. 276, no. 1, page 228-230, XP004018002 [A] 1-17 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-6090(95)08059-7