Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0860765

EP0860765 - Input device and method for data processing devices [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.10.1999
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.1999Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.11.1999 [1999/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Helmreich, Stephan, Dipl.-Ing.
Peter-Jordan-Strasse 157/1/11
1180 Wien / AT
[1998/35]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1998/35]
Representative(s)Puchberger, Rolf
Puchberger, Berger & Partner Reichsratsstrasse 13
1010 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [1998/35]Puchberger, Rolf, Dipl. Ing.
Patentanwaltskanzlei Dipl.-Ing. Rolf Puchberger, Dipl.-Ing. Peter Puchberger, Dipl.-Ing. Claudia Grabherr-Puchberger, Singerstrasse 13, Postfach 55
1010 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date98890039.513.02.1998
[1998/35]
Priority number, dateAT1997000028019.02.1997         Original published format: AT 28097
[1998/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0860765
Date:26.08.1998
Language:DE
[1998/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.05.1998
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/023
[1998/35]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [1999/19]
Former [1998/35]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Eingabevorrichtung und -verfahren für Datenverarbeitungsvorrichtungen[1998/35]
English:Input device and method for data processing devices[1998/35]
French:Dispositif et méthode d'entrée pour dispositifs de traitement de données[1998/35]
Examination procedure27.02.1999Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1999/46]
22.06.1999Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1999/46]
Documents cited:Search[X]DE9310983U  (SAUER RAINER [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,8,10 * page 4, line 10 - line 13; figure 3; claim 1.10 *;
 [X]DE4321825  (SAUER RAINER [DE]) [X] 1,2,7,8,10 * column 3, line 30 - line 33; figure 3; claim 2.10 *;
 [PX]US5664896  (BLUMBERG MARVIN R [US]) [PX] 1,2,7,8,10 * column 13, line 31 - line 44; figure 21 *;
 [A]EP0670554  (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 3,9 * column 2, line 31 - line 36; figure 2; claim 1 *