Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0885695

EP0885695 - Percussion apparatus with a device for reversing the pressure on the piston [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1998/52]Device for reversing the pressure on a piston
[2002/34]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.02.2004
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 29.07.2009  [2009/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Böhler Baugeräte GmbH & Co KG
Werk-VI-Strasse 55
8605 Kapfenberg / AT
[2002/10]
Former [1999/45]For all designated states
Böhler Pneumatik International GmbH & Co KG
Werk-VI-Strasse 55
8605 Kapfenberg / AT
Former [1998/52]For all designated states
Böhler Baugeräte GmbH
Werk VI-Strasse
8605 Kapfenberg / AT
Inventor(s)01 / Auer, Anton
Sonnbichl 24
9313 St. Georgen am Längsee / AT
02 / Garger, Erwin
Stefan Jäger-Strasse 1
8605 Kapfenberg / AT
03 / Hasewend, Gerhard
Brunner-Weg 5
8605 Parschlug / AT
 [2002/49]
Former [1998/52]01 / Auer, Anton
Sonnbichl 24
9313 St. Georgen am Längsee / AT
02 / Garger, Erwin
Stefan Jäger-Strasse 1
8605 Kapfenberg / AT
03 / Hasewind, Gerhard
Brunner-Weg 5
8605 Parschlug / AT
Representative(s)Wildhack, Helmut , et al
Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte OG Landstrasser Hauptstrasse 50
1030 Wien / AT
[2009/31]
Former [2003/16]Wildhack, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Helmut Wildhack, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Gerhard Jellinek, Landstrasser Hauptstrasse 50
1030 Wien / AT
Former [1998/52]Wildhack, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Dr.
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Leo Brauneiss, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Helmut Wildhack, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Gerhard Jellinek, Landstrasser Hauptstrasse 50
1030 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date98890168.203.06.1998
[1998/52]
Priority number, dateAT1997000103013.06.1997         Original published format: AT 103097
[1998/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0885695
Date:23.12.1998
Language:DE
[1998/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0885695
Date:05.07.2000
[2000/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0885695
Date:16.04.2003
Language:DE
[2003/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:B23Q5/033, B25D9/14
[2000/27]
Former International [1998/52]B25D9/14
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/11]
Former [1998/52]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schlaggerät mit einer Einrichtung zum Umsteuern der Druckbeaufschlagung des Schlagkolbens[2002/34]
English:Percussion apparatus with a device for reversing the pressure on the piston[2002/34]
French:Appareil à percussions avec un dispositif de renversement de la pression sur le piston[2002/42]
Former [1998/52]Einrichtung zum Umsteuern der Druckbeaufschlagung eines Schlagkolbens
Former [1998/52]Device for reversing the pressure on a piston
Former [1998/52]Dispositif de renversement de la pression sur un piston
Examination procedure29.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
06.01.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
25.05.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, IE, MC
05.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.01.2003Fee for grant paid
08.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
28.02.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
28.02.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
28.02.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200003   M06   Fee paid on   24.08.2000
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI16.04.2003
NL16.04.2003
LU03.06.2003
BE30.06.2003
DK16.07.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
[2007/17]
Former [2004/39]FI16.04.2003
NL16.04.2003
LU03.06.2003
DK16.07.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
Former [2004/23]FI16.04.2003
NL16.04.2003
DK16.07.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
Former [2004/05]FI16.04.2003
NL16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
Former [2004/02]NL16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
Former [2004/01]NL16.04.2003
PT16.07.2003
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0150170  (VER EDELSTAHLWERKE AG [AT]) [AD] 1;
 [A]JPS6124880  (DAIHATSU MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1 * figures 4-6 *;
 [A]JPS58113670  (NIPPON DENSO CO) [A] 1 * figures 3-7 *;
 [A]JPS5899566  (SAGINOMIYA SEISAKUSHO INC) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *