Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0914913

EP0914913 - Device for the edge trimming of round wood [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.09.2004
Database last updated on 17.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.09.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.11.2004  [2004/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Holzindustrie Preding Gesellschaft m.b.H.
Preding 225
8504 Preding / AT
[1999/19]
Inventor(s)01 / Leitinger, Hans-Peter Ing.
Preding 225
8504 Preding / AT
[1999/19]
Representative(s)Müllner, Erwin , et al
Patentanwälte Müllner, Katschinka, Müllner Weihburggasse 9 Postfach 159
1014 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [1999/19]Müllner, Erwin, Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Dr. Erwin Müllner Dipl.-Ing. Werner Katschinka Postfach 159 Weihburggasse 9
1010 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date98890194.803.07.1998
[1999/19]
Priority number, dateAT19970000688U04.11.1997         Original published format: AT 68897 U
[1999/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0914913
Date:12.05.1999
Language:DE
[1999/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0914913
Date:18.10.2000
[2000/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0914913
Date:12.11.2003
Language:DE
[2003/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:B27L11/00
[1999/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE [2003/46]
Former [2001/28]AT,  DE 
Former [2001/27]AT,  BE 
Former [1999/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesSI11.04.2001
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Kantholz aus Rundhölzern[1999/19]
English:Device for the edge trimming of round wood[1999/19]
French:Dispositif pour la fabrication de bois équarri à partir de troncs d'arbre[1999/19]
Examination procedure11.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/24]
19.04.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
25.09.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
03.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.01.2003Fee for grant paid
21.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.08.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
17.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
17.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
11.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
01.06.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
01.06.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
01.06.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
01.06.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
01.06.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
01.06.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
01.06.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
01.06.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
01.06.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
01.06.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
01.06.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
01.06.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
01.06.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
01.06.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
01.06.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
01.06.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]DE4443727  (SOEDERHAMNS VERKSTAEDER AB [SE]) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [L]EP0891846  (HOLZINDUSTRIE PREDING GES M B [AT]) [L] 6-12 * L:Priorität;; claims 6-12 *