Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1015769

EP1015769 - FLUID PUMP WITH A FLEXIBLE TOOTHED BELT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.04.2003
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.06.2003  [2003/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Woodhouse, Timothy Charles
2 Carrington Hall Road, Drayton Parslow Milton Keynes
Bucks MK17 0GP / GB
For all designated states
TICKNER, Stephen Ronald
Holly Bush House, Dunstable Road
Studham, Bedfordshire, LU6 2QJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
Woodhouse, Timothy Charles
2 Carrington Hall Road, Drayton Parslow
Milton Keynes, Bucks MK17 0GP / GB
For all designated states
TICKNER, Stephen Ronald
Holly Bush House, Dunstable Road
Studham, Bedfordshire, LU6 2QJ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/27]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2003/14]
Former [2000/27]Goodenough, Nigel
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date98900095.505.01.1998
[2000/27]
WO1998GB00007
Priority number, dateGB1997000027708.01.1997         Original published format: GB 9700277
GB1997002650716.12.1997         Original published format: GB 9726507
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9830801
Date:16.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1015769
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.1998
[2000/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.07.1998
ClassificationInternational:F04C2/14, F04C5/00
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/27]
TitleGerman:ZAHNRIEMENPUMPE[2000/27]
English:FLUID PUMP WITH A FLEXIBLE TOOTHED BELT[2000/27]
French:POMPE POURVUE D'UNE COURROIE CRANTEE[2000/27]
Entry into regional phase08.07.1999National basic fee paid 
08.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
08.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/27]
11.07.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
06.05.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
16.07.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
12.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.11.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/24]
13.01.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2003/24]
Request for further processing for:16.07.2002Request for further processing filed
16.07.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
31.07.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.02.200003   M06   Fee paid on   11.02.2000
31.01.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US2745355  (MOSBACHER BRUCE H) [X] 1-21 * figures 2,5; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE4218148  (BROX DIETER [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4414319  (BROX DIETER [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE19510079  (BROX DIETER [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE9109130U  (BEYER);
 [A]FR1221014  (MUNRO)