Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1006942

EP1006942 - LUMINAL ENDOPROSTHESIS FOR RAMIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.11.2005
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medicorp R&D Benelux S.A.
Rue Fish Club, 6
7000 Mons / BE
[2000/24]
Inventor(s)01 / FRID, Noureddine
Kerkveldstraat 190
B-1650 Beersel / BE
[2000/24]
Representative(s)Vandeberg, Marie-Paule L.G. , et al
Office Kirkpatrick
32, avenue Wolfers
1310 La Hulpe / BE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Vandeberg, Marie-Paule L.G. , et al
Office Kirkpatrick 32, avenue Wolfers
1310 La Hulpe / BE
Former [2000/24]Vandeberg, Marie-Paule L.G. , et al
Office Kirkpatrick S.A., 32, Avenue Wolfers
1310 La Hulpe / BE
Application number, filing date98900127.616.01.1998
[2000/24]
WO1998IB00067
Priority number, dateBE1997000004316.01.1997         Original published format: BE 9700043
[2000/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9831303
Date:23.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1006942
Date:14.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1998
[2000/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1006942
Date:29.12.2004
Language:EN
[2005/01]
Search report(s)International search reportEP23.07.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/06
[2000/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2004/34]
Former [2000/24]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:INTRALUMINALE ENDOPROTHESE FÜR VERZWEIGUNG[2004/30]
English:LUMINAL ENDOPROSTHESIS FOR RAMIFICATION[2000/24]
French:ENDOPROTHESE LUMINALE POUR RAMIFICATION[2000/24]
Former [2000/24]LUMINALE ENDOPROTHESE ZUR KANALVERZWEIGUNG
Entry into regional phase16.07.1999National basic fee paid 
16.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/24]
07.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.10.2004Fee for grant paid
27.10.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
16.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
08.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200306   M06   Fee paid on   16.07.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.12.2004
BE29.12.2004
CH29.12.2004
FI29.12.2004
LI29.12.2004
NL29.12.2004
IE17.01.2005
DK29.03.2005
GB29.03.2005
GR29.03.2005
SE29.03.2005
PT29.05.2005
[2008/15]
Former [2007/17]AT29.12.2004
BE29.12.2004
CH29.12.2004
FI29.12.2004
LI29.12.2004
NL29.12.2004
IE17.01.2005
DK29.03.2005
GB29.03.2005
GR29.03.2005
SE29.03.2005
Former [2006/24]AT29.12.2004
BE29.12.2004
CH29.12.2004
FI29.12.2004
LI29.12.2004
NL29.12.2004
IE17.01.2005
DK29.03.2005
GB29.03.2005
GR29.03.2005
Former [2006/13]AT29.12.2004
BE29.12.2004
CH29.12.2004
FI29.12.2004
LI29.12.2004
NL29.12.2004
DK29.03.2005
GB29.03.2005
GR29.03.2005
Former [2006/12]AT29.12.2004
BE29.12.2004
CH29.12.2004
FI29.12.2004
LI29.12.2004
DK29.03.2005
GR29.03.2005
Former [2005/51]AT29.12.2004
BE29.12.2004
FI29.12.2004
GR29.03.2005
Former [2005/36]AT29.12.2004
FI29.12.2004
GR29.03.2005
Former [2005/26]FI29.12.2004
GR29.03.2005
Former [2005/24]FI29.12.2004
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0698380  (ETHICON INC [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]NL1000180C  (LAURENS SIBINGA MULDER [NL], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [DA]WO9634580  (DIBIE ALAIN [FR]) [DA] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9625124  (CORVITA CORP [US]) [A] 13 * page 16, paragraph 3 - page 19, paragraph 1 *;
 [A]WO9400179  (AMERICAN BIOMED INC [US], et al)
by applicantWO8303752
 GB1205743
 US4994071
 US5609605
 EP0539237