blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0974157

EP0974157 - COMPONENT TAPING METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.08.2005
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - applicantpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
For all designated states
Nihon Garter Co., Ltd
3-5-13, Imai, Oume-shi
Tokyo 198 / JP
For all designated states
Daiichi Co., Ltd
15, Negishi Iruma-shi
Saitama 358-0034 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2008/47]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
For all designated states
Nihon Garter Co., Ltd
3-5-13, Imai, Oume-shi
Tokyo 198 / JP
For all designated states
Daiichi Co., Ltd
15, Negishi
Iruma-shi, Saitama 358-0034 / JP
Former [2004/40]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0000 / JP
For all designated states
Nihon Garter Co., Ltd
3-5-13, Imai, Oume-shi
Tokyo 198 / JP
For all designated states
Daiichi Co., Ltd
15, Negishi
Iruma-shi, Saitama 358-0034 / JP
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0000 / JP
For all designated states
Nihon Garter Co., Ltd
3-5-13, Imai, Oume-shi
Tokyo 198 / JP
For all designated states
Daiichi Co., Ltd
929-1, Shimofujisawahi
Iruma-shi, Saitama 358 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / HIKITA, Osamu
1-25-21, Taguchiyama
Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP
02 / KUBO, Susumu
318-7, Oume
Oume-shi, Tokyo 198 / JP
03 / OSHIMA, Kazunori
720-13, Miyadera
Iruma-shi, Saitama 358 / JP
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 31 02 60
80102 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Arnulfstrasse 25
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date98900369.414.01.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998JP00117
Priority number, dateJP1997000635017.01.1997         Original published format: JP 635097
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9832160
Date:23.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974157
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974157
Date:06.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.07.1998
ClassificationIPC:H01L21/00, H05K13/00
[2000/04]
CPC:
H05K13/003 (EP,US); Y10T29/53052 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/04]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFSPULEN VON BAUTEILEN[2004/14]
English:COMPONENT TAPING METHOD AND APPARATUS[2000/04]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE FORMATION D'UN RUBAN DE COMPOSANTS[2000/04]
Former [2000/04]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM GURTEN VON BAUTEILEN
Entry into regional phase17.08.1999National basic fee paid 
17.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
17.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.08.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
03.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
10.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.07.2004Fee for grant paid
29.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
02.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US5472085  (GELZER JOHN R [US]) [A] 1,2,6 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 40; figures 6-11 *;
 [A]US4681221  (CHICKANOSKY JOHN J [US], et al) [A] 1-3,6 * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 20; figures 1,4,9,10 *;
 [A]EP0660655  (GOLD IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3,6 * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 31; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]JPH046055
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920413), vol. 16, no. 149, Database accession no. (M - 1234), & JP04006055 A 19920110 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1,6 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.