Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1020721

EP1020721 - NITROGEN OXIDES DETECTION METHOD, AND SENSOR ELEMENT FOR DETECTION OF NITROGEN OXIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.12.2001
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.02.2002  [2002/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OSAKA GAS CO., LTD.
1-2, Hiranomachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka-fu 541 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
OSAKA GAS CO., LTD.
1-2, Hiranomachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 541 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KUDO, Shuzo, c/o Osaka Gas Co.Ltd.
1-2,Hiranomachi 4-chome
Chuo-ku Osaka / JP
02 / HIGAKI, Katsuki, c/o Osaka Gas Co.Ltd.
1-2,Hiranomachi 4-chome
Chuo-ku Osaka / JP
03 / OHNISHI, Hisao, c/o Osaka Gas Co.Ltd.
1-2,Hiranomachi 4-chome
Chuo-ku Osaka / JP
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Petersen, Frank , et al
Lemcke, Brommer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Bismarckstrasse 16
76133 Karlsruhe / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]Petersen, Frank, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 11 08 47
76058 Karlsruhe / DE
Application number, filing date98900413.016.01.1998
[2000/29]
WO1998JP00166
Priority number, dateJP1997000734320.01.1997         Original published format: JP 734397
[2000/29]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9832007
Date:23.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1020721
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1998
[2000/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP23.07.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01N27/12, G01N33/00, G01N27/407
[2000/40]
Former International [2000/29]G01N27/12
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/29]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS VON STICHOXIDEN, UND SENSORELEMENT ZUM NACHWEISEN VIN STICHOXIDEN[2000/29]
English:NITROGEN OXIDES DETECTION METHOD, AND SENSOR ELEMENT FOR DETECTION OF NITROGEN OXIDES[2000/29]
French:PROCEDE DE DETECTION D'OXYDES D'AZOTE ET ELEMENT DE CAPTEUR PERMETTANT DE DETECTER DES OXYDES AZOTES[2000/29]
Entry into regional phase29.12.1998Translation filed 
29.12.1998National basic fee paid 
29.12.1998Search fee paid 
29.12.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
29.12.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
29.12.1998Examination requested  [2000/29]
01.08.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/07]
07.09.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPH07140099  ;
 [Y]EP0632265  (OSAKA GAS CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,5-10 * page 3, line 36 - line 44 * * page 5, line 13 - line 49 * * page 8, line 30 - line 39 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 1995, no. 09, & JP07140099 A 19950602 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 1,2,5-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] * * table 3 *
International search[A]JPH05332971  (OSAKA GAS CO LTD);
 [A]JPH0727730  (KOKUSAI CHODENDO SANGYO GIJUTS, et al);
 [AP]JPH09288078  (OSAKA GAS CO LTD);
 [A]  - SBERVEGLIERI G, ET AL., "BISMUTH-DOPED TIN OXIDE THIN-FILM GAS SENSORS", Sensors and Actuators B: Chemical: international journal devoted to research and development of physical and chemical transducers, Elsevier BV, NL, NL, (19910101), vol. 03, doi:10.1016/0925-4005(91)80004-4, ISSN 0925-4005, pages 183 - 189, XP002911194

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0925-4005(91)80004-4