Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969014

EP0969014 - BETA-KETOACYL-ACP-SYNTHETASE II ENZYME AND GENE ENCODING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/01]$g(b)-KETOACYL-ACP-SYNTHETASE II ENZYME AND GENE ENCODING THE SAME
[2000/30]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.08.2009
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, DK, GB, IT, LI
published on 03.02.2010  [2010/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kirin Holdings Kabushiki Kaisha
10-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2007/45]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
KIRIN BEER KABUSHIKI KAISHA
10-1, Shinkawa 2-chome
Chuo-Ku, Tokyo 104 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / FERRI, R., Stefano c/o Kirin Beer Kab.Kai.Kib.Gij.
1-13-5, Fukuura, Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
02 / TOGURI, Toshihiro;-Kirin Beer Kabushiki Kaisha
1-13-5, Fukuura;,Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236 / JP
[2000/09]
Former [2000/01]01 / FERRI, R., Stefano
Via S. Egidio, 13
I-37121 Verona / IT
02 / TOGURI, Toshihiro;-Kirin Beer Kabushiki Kaisha
1-13-5, Fukuura;,Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236 / JP
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date98900438.720.01.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998JP00194
Priority number, dateJP1997001143024.01.1997         Original published format: JP 1143097
[2000/01]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9832770
Date:30.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969014
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969014
Date:08.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.07.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/405, C12N9/10, C12N15/54, C12N15/31, C12N1/21
[2008/21]
Former International [2000/01]C07K14/405, C12N9/10, C12N15/54, C12N15/31, C12N1/21, // (C12N15/54, C12R1:89),(C12N9/10, C12R1:19)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2008/21]
Former [2000/01]BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  GB,  IT,  LI,  NL 
TitleGerman:BETA-KETOACYL-ACP-SYNTHELASE II-ENZYM UND DAFÜR KODIERENDES GEN[2000/01]
English:BETA-KETOACYL-ACP-SYNTHETASE II ENZYME AND GENE ENCODING THE SAME[2000/30]
French:ENZYME BETA-CETOACYL-ACP-SYNTHETASE ET GENE LA CODANT[2000/30]
Former [2000/01]$g(b)-KETOACYL-ACP-SYNTHETASE II ENZYME AND GENE ENCODING THE SAME
Former [2000/01]ENZYME $g(b)-CETOACYL-ACP-SYNTHETASE ET GENE LA CODANT
Entry into regional phase23.07.1999Translation filed 
23.07.1999National basic fee paid 
23.07.1999Search fee paid 
23.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.06.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
23.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
17.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.10.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.11.2007
23.10.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
06.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.11.2007Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
22.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.08.2008Fee for grant paid
19.08.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.07.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
29.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
26.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
26.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
23.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
25.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
23.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE08.10.2008
DK08.10.2008
IT08.10.2008
NL08.10.2008
GB20.01.2009
CH31.01.2009
LI31.01.2009
[2010/05]
Former [2009/32]BE08.10.2008
NL08.10.2008
Former [2009/30]NL08.10.2008
Documents cited:Search[XY]  SHEN Z ET AL, "ISOLATION OF VIBRIO HARVEYI ACYL CARRIER PROTEIN AND THE FABG, ACPP, AND FABF GENES INVOLVED IN FATTY ACID BIOSYNTHESIS", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (1996), vol. 178, no. 2, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 571 - 573, XP002911271 [X] 1-8 *the whole document, in particular p. 572, left column, lines 3-6* [Y] 1-8
 [Y]  FROEHLICH, J.E. ET AL., "Purification and characterization of acyl carrier protein from two cyanobacteria species", EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1990), vol. 193, pages 817 - 825, XP001069902 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document, in particular: abstract, p. 822, right column, lines 39-41; p. 824, right column, lines 9-10, p. 825, lines 16-20*

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1432-1033.1990.tb19405.x
 [Y]  KANEKO T ET AL, "SEQUENCE ANALYSIS OF THE GENOME OF THE UNICELLULAR CYANOBACTERIUM SYNECHOCYSTIS SP. STRAIN PCC6803. II. SEQUENCE DETERMINATION OF THE ENTIRE GENOME AND ASSIGNEMENT OF POTENTIAL PROTEIN-CODING REGIONS", DNA RESEARCH, UNIVERSAL ACADEMY PRESS, JP, (1996), vol. 3, ISSN 1340-2838, pages 109 - 136, XP002928726 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document, in particular table 1, page 119*

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/dnares/3.3.109
International search[X]JPH07501446  ;
 [X]JPH06500234  ;
 [A]  - WORSHAM L. M. S., ET AL., "EARLY CATALYTIC STEPS OF EUGLENA GRACILIS CHLOROPLAST TYPE II FATTY ACID SYNTHASE.", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA., ELSEVIER, NL, NL, (19930101), vol. 1170., ISSN 0006-3002, pages 62 - 71., XP002919081
 [A]  - GARWIN J. L., KLAGES A. L., CRONAN J. E., "STRUCTURAL, ENZYMATIC, AND GENETIC STUDIES OF BETA-KETOACYL-ACYL CARRIER PROTEIN SYNTHASES I AN DII OF ESCHERICHIA COLI.", Journal of Biological Chemistry, American Society for Biochemistry and Molecular Biology, US, US, (19800101), vol. 255., no. 24., ISSN 0021-9258, pages 11949 - 11956., XP002911268
 [A]  - MAGNUSON K., CAREY M. R., CRONAN J. E., "THE PUTATIVE FABJ GENE OF ESCHERICHIA COLI FATTY ACID SYNTHESIS IS THE FABF GENE.", Journal of Bacteriology, American Society for Microbiology, US, US, (19950101), vol. 177., no. 12., ISSN 0021-9193, pages 3593 - 3595., XP002911269
 [A]  - SIGGAARD-ANDERSEN M., ET AL., "THE FABJ-ENCODED BETA-KETOACYL-ÚACYL3⁄4 CARRIER PROTEIN3⁄4 SYNTHASE IV FROM ESCHERICHIA COLI IS SENSITIVE TO CERULENIN AND SPECIFIC FOR SHORT-CHAIN SUBSTRATES.", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, National Academy of Sciences, US, US, (19940101), vol. 91., no. 23., doi:10.1073/pnas.91.23.11027, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 11027 - 11031., XP002911270

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.91.23.11027
 [A]  - SHEN Z., BYERS D. W., "ISOLATION OF VIBRIO HARVEYI ACYL CARRIER PROTEIN AND THE FABG, ACPP, AND FABF GENES INVOLVED IN FATTY ACID BIOSYNTHESIS.", Journal of Bacteriology, American Society for Microbiology, US, US, (19960101), vol. 178., no. 02., ISSN 0021-9193, pages 571 - 573., XP002911271