Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973493

EP0973493 - SUNSCREENS FOR PROTECTION FROM SUN RADIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  23.11.2007
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yissum Research Development Company of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem Ltd.
46 Jabotinsky Street
91042 Jerusalem / IL
For all designated states
CONSEJO SUPERIOR DE INVESTIGACIONES CIENTIFICAS
C/ Serrano 117
28006 Madrid / ES
[N/P]
Former [2007/52]For all designated states
Yissum Research Development Company of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem
46 Jabotinsky Street
91042 Jerusalem / IL
For all designated states
CONSEJO SUPERIOR DE INVESTIGACIONES CIENTIFICAS
Calle Serrano, 117
28006 Madrid / ES
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
YISSUM RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT COMPANY of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem
46 Jabotinsky Street
91042 Jerusalem / IL
For all designated states
CONSEJO SUPERIOR DE INVESTIGACIONES CIENTIFICAS
Calle Serrano, 117
28006 Madrid / ES
Inventor(s)01 / AVNIR, David
Novomiesky Moshe Street 2
96908 Jerusalem / IL
02 / COHEN, Levy, David
Santo Angel, 81, escalera 3, 1A
E-28043 Madrid / ES
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Ahner, Francis , et al
Cabinet Regimbeau
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2005/22]Ahner, Francis , et al
Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR
Former [2003/35]Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
TBK-Patent, P.O. Box 20 19 18
80019 München / DE
Former [2003/21](deleted)
...
Former [2001/14]Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/04]Bühling, Gerhard, Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date98900657.215.01.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998IL00021
Priority number, dateIL1997012002216.01.1997         Original published format: IL 12002297
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9831333
Date:23.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973493
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1998
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973493
Date:03.12.2003
Language:EN
[2003/49]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0973493
Date:26.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.07.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/89, A61Q17/04
[2007/50]
Former International [2000/04]A61K7/42
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:SONNENSCHUTZMITTEL ZUM SCHUTZ GEGEN SONNENSTRAHLUNG[2000/04]
English:SUNSCREENS FOR PROTECTION FROM SUN RADIATION[2000/04]
French:FILTRES SOLAIRES POUR PROTEGER CONTRE LE RAYONNEMENT SOLAIRE[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase14.07.1999National basic fee paid 
14.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
14.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
07.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.10.2003Fee for grant paid
06.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.09.2004  13.09.2004  WITHDRAWN
L'OREAL
14, rue Royale
75008 PARIS / FR
Opponent's representative
Bulle, Françoise
Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71/73
80335 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2006/22]
Opponent(s)01  03.09.2004  13.09.2004  WITHDRAWN
L'OREAL
14, rue Royale
75008 PARIS / FR
Opponent's representative
Bulle, Françoise
Bureau Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73
80335 München / DE
Former [2004/44]
Opponent(s)01  03.09.2004   
L'OREAL
14, rue Royale
75008 PARIS / FR
Opponent's representative
Bulle, Françoise
Bureau D.A. Casalonga-Josse Paul-Heyse-Strasse 33
80336 München / DE
08.10.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.04.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.04.2006Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.05.2006
27.04.2006Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.05.2006Date of oral proceedings
13.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
10.08.2006Reply to a communication from the opposition division
02.11.2006Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
12.11.2006Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
01.03.2007Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
29.05.2007Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
22.10.1999FR   M01   Fee paid on   03.11.1999
22.10.1999GB   M01   Fee paid on   03.11.1999
22.10.1999GR   M01   Fee paid on   03.11.1999
22.10.1999IE   M01   Fee paid on   03.11.1999
22.10.1999IT   M01   Fee paid on   03.11.1999
22.10.1999LU   M01   Fee paid on   03.11.1999
22.10.1999MC   M01   Fee paid on   03.11.1999
22.10.1999NL   M01   Fee paid on   03.11.1999
22.10.1999PT   M01   Fee paid on   03.11.1999
22.10.1999SE   M01   Fee paid on   03.11.1999
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.12.2003
BE03.12.2003
CH03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
LI03.12.2003
NL03.12.2003
IE15.01.2004
LU15.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
DK03.03.2004
GR03.03.2004
SE03.03.2004
PT03.05.2004
[2008/15]
Former [2005/23]AT03.12.2003
BE03.12.2003
CH03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
LI03.12.2003
NL03.12.2003
IE15.01.2004
LU15.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
DK03.03.2004
GR03.03.2004
SE03.03.2004
Former [2005/03]AT03.12.2003
BE03.12.2003
CH03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
LI03.12.2003
NL03.12.2003
IE15.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
DK03.03.2004
GR03.03.2004
SE03.03.2004
Former [2005/02]AT03.12.2003
BE03.12.2003
CH03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
LI03.12.2003
NL03.12.2003
MC31.01.2004
DK03.03.2004
GR03.03.2004
SE03.03.2004
Former [2004/52]AT03.12.2003
BE03.12.2003
CH03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
LI03.12.2003
NL03.12.2003
GR03.03.2004
SE03.03.2004
Former [2004/33]AT03.12.2003
CH03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
LI03.12.2003
NL03.12.2003
GR03.03.2004
SE03.03.2004
Former [2004/31]AT03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
SE03.03.2004
Former [2004/26]FI03.12.2003
SE03.03.2004
Former [2004/24]SE03.03.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0281034  (YAMAMOTO TOHRU) [X] 1,2,9,14,16-19,24,25,29,31 * claims 1,4,6,7 * * page 6, lines 38-41 *;
 [X]JPH0899838  ;
 [X]JPH07315859  (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD);
 [X]JPH05178995  (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD)
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960830), vol. 096, no. 008, [X] 1-3,14,16-20,24,29-31 * abstract *
 [X]  - K.DOSHITA E.A., "Glass flakes containing dispersed metal oxides, especially for use in cosmetics and sol-gel process for their manufacture", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19960318), vol. 124, no. 12, Database accession no. 153660, XP002065558 [X] 1-3,6,7,9,14,16,18-20,22,23,28-31 * abstract *
 [X]  - K.MIZOHATA, "granular coloring materialsof organic-inorganic composites", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19931227), vol. 119, no. 26, Database accession no. 273503, XP002065559 [X] 1-3,9,14,16-19,24 * abstract *
Examination   - Article "Surface modification of inorganic pigments with organic UV absorbers", from T.Nakatsuka,Colloids and surfaces, 34 (1988/89),323-324
    - The physics and Chemistry of sol-gel processing, C.F.Brinker and G.W.Sherer,199,Chapter 3:Hydrolysis and condensation II:silicates, pages 97-104
    - JP 02 251240(Pias Corporation)and its translation
    - JP 02 002867(Pias Corporation) and its translation
    - Article "Organic fluorescent dyes trapped in silica and silica- titania thin films by the sol-gel method. Photophysical,film and cage properties". D.Avnir and al.Journal of non-crystalline solids 74(1985), 395-406
    - Article "Improvement of photofatigue resistance of spirooxazine in organic-inorganic composite synthesized via the sol-gel process",Hou et al, SPIE Vol.2288 Sol-gel Optics III(1994),328-338