Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970683

EP0970683 - PERSISTENT HAIR TONIC [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.11.2006
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.12.2006  [2006/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TAISHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD
24-1 Takata 3-chome Toshima-ku
Tokyo 171 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
TAISHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD
24-1 Takata 3-chome Toshima-ku
Tokyo 171 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SUZUKI, Kenichi-Taisho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
24-1, Takata 3-chome
Toshima-ku, Tokyo 171 / JP
02 / IMAMURA, Kouji-Taisho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
24-1, Takata 3-chome
Toshima-ku, Tokyo 171 / JP
03 / MORIOKA, Susumu-Taisho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
24-1, Takata 3-chome
Toshima-ku, Tokyo 171 / JP
04 / TANAKA, Shigeo-Taisho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
24-1, Takata 3-chome
Toshima-ku, Tokyo 171 / JP
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Albrecht, Thomas , et al
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/44]Albrecht, Thomas, Dr. , et al
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [2000/02]Weisert, Annekäte, Dipl.-Ing. Dr.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Kraus Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date98900688.722.01.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998JP00227
Priority number, dateJP1997001053123.01.1997         Original published format: JP 1053197
[2000/02]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9832417
Date:30.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970683
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.1998
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.07.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.07.2005
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/06, A61K31/505
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:DAUERHAFTES HAARTONIKUM[2000/02]
English:PERSISTENT HAIR TONIC[2000/02]
French:TONIQUE CAPILLAIRE PERSISTANT[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase12.07.1999Translation filed 
12.07.1999National basic fee paid 
12.07.1999Search fee paid 
12.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
12.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
12.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
02.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.06.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/50]
19.07.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
07.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
12.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
12.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2274060  (MERCK & CO) [X] 1-11 * example C; claims 1,7,8 *
International search[X]JPH08277209  ;
 [X]JPS6468310  ;
 [A]JPH01132510  ;
 [A]JPH0262818  ;
 [A]JPH0640844