Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969542

EP0969542 - BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.04.2011
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.04.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.06.2011  [2011/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2006/18]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / AIHARA, Shigeru c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
02 / TAKEMURA, Daigo c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
03 / SHIOTA, Hisashi c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
04 / ARAGANE, Jun c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
05 / URUSHIBATA, Hiroaki c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
06 / YOSHIDA, Yasuhiro c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
07 / HAMANO, Kouki c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
08 / MURAI, Michio c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
09 / INUZUKA, Takayuki c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
 [2010/19]
Former [2000/01]01 / AIHARA, Shigeru
Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
02 / TAKEMURA, Daigo
Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
03 / SHIOTA, Hisashi
Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
04 / ARAGANE, Jun
Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
05 / URUSHIBATA, Hiroaki
Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
06 / YOSHIDA, Yasuhiro
Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
07 / HAMANO, Kouji
Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
08 / MURAI, Michio
Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
09 / INUZUKA, Takayuki
Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
Representative(s)Sajda, Wolf E. , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Sajda, Wolf E., Dipl.-Phys. , et al
MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date98900705.922.01.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998JP00248
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9938224
Date:29.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969542
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.1999
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969542
Date:23.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP29.07.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.02.2005
ClassificationInternational:H01M10/052, H01M6/06, H01M6/14, H01M6/18, H01M10/30
[2010/25]
Former International [2000/01]H01M10/40, H01M6/06, H01M6/14, H01M6/18, H01M10/30
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/01]
TitleGerman:BATTERIE[2000/01]
English:BATTERY[2000/01]
French:BATTERIE[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase22.09.1999Translation filed 
22.09.1999National basic fee paid 
22.09.1999Search fee paid 
22.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
21.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.12.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.03.2010Fee for grant paid
29.03.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.03.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
23.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
29.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
29.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
29.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
27.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
30.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
30.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
29.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
29.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
27.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]JPH09500485  ;
 [X]JPH0652891  (SHIN KOBE ELECTRIC MACHINERY, et al)
Examination JPH09312152
  US5512389