Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974737

EP0974737 - COMBINED CYCLE POWER PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.06.2007
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD.
5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
[2006/33]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd.
5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / WAKAZONO, Osamu, Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd.
Takasago Mach. Works 1-1 Araicho Shinhama 2-chome
Takasago-shi Hyogo 676 / JP
02 / KIMURA, Hideo, Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd.
Takasago Mach. Works 1-1 Araicho Shinhama 2-chome
Takasago-shi Hyogo 676 / JP
03 / FUKUIZUMI, Yasushi Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Ltd
Takasago Mach. Works 1-1 Araicho Shinhama 2-chome
Takasago-shi Hyogo 676 / JP
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Poulin, Gérard , et al
BREVALEX
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Poulin, Gérard , et al
Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2000/04]Poulin, Gérard , et al
Société de Protection des Inventions 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98900712.523.01.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998JP00258
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9937889
Date:29.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974737
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.1999
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974737
Date:16.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP29.07.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:F01K23/10, F02C7/18
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/04]
TitleGerman:KRAFTANLAGE MIT KOMBINIERTEM KREISLAUF[2000/04]
English:COMBINED CYCLE POWER PLANT[2000/04]
French:CENTRALE A CYCLE COMBINE[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase22.09.1999Translation filed 
22.09.1999National basic fee paid 
22.09.1999Search fee paid 
22.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
27.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.07.2006Fee for grant paid
04.07.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.05.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
17.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
18.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
21.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
21.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
20.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH16.08.2006
FR16.08.2006
IT16.08.2006
LI16.08.2006
GB23.01.2007
[2008/52]
Former [2008/23]CH16.08.2006
IT16.08.2006
LI16.08.2006
GB23.01.2007
FR11.05.2007
Former [2008/15]CH16.08.2006
IT16.08.2006
LI16.08.2006
GB23.01.2007
Former [2007/17]CH16.08.2006
LI16.08.2006
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]JPH094417  ;
 [X]JPH09280010  ;
 [X]JPH09112214  ;
 [Y]JPH09189236
by applicantJPH05163960