Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1050098

EP1050098 - MODULAR ACTUATOR, AND BRAKE CALLIPER COMPRISING SUCH ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.11.2003
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2008Change - representativepublished on 28.05.2008  [2008/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SKF Engineering & Research Centre B.V.
P.O. Box 2350
3430 DT Nieuwegein / NL
[2000/45]
Inventor(s)01 / KAPAAN, Hendrikus, Jan
Waterhoen 5
NL-3435 DM Nieuwegein / NL
02 / ZWARTS, Jacobus
Carmenlaan 5
NL-3438 VA Nieuwegein / NL
03 / RINSMA, Andries, Christian
Boomgaardstraat 25
NL-8933 GB Leeuwarden / NL
04 / VAN WINDEN, Johannes, Albertus
Mönchhofstrasse 3b
DE-69120 Heidelberg / DE
05 / DRUET, Clair
283, route la Carnalaz
F-73420 Drumettaz Clarafond / FR
06 / DE VRIES, Alexander, Jan, Carel
N. Beetsstraat 69
NL-4003 KA Tiel / NL
07 / OLSCHEWSKI, Armin, Herbet, Emil, August
Strösselstrasse 8
DE-97422 Schweinfurt / DE
08 / FUCKS, Thomas, Wilhelm
Salierallee 54
D-52066 Aachen / DE
[2000/45]
Representative(s)van Westenbrugge, Andries , et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]van Westenbrugge, Andries , et al
Postbus 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Former [2003/16]van Westenbrugge, Andries , et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
Former [2000/45]Jorritsma, Ruurd
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date98900769.520.01.1998
[2000/45]
WO1998NL00033
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9937010
Date:22.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1050098
Date:08.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1999
[2000/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1050098
Date:02.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:H02K7/06, F16H25/20, F16D65/16
[2000/45]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/45]
TitleGerman:MODULARE BETÄTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, SOWIE BREMSSATTEL MIT EINER SOLCHEN BETÄTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2000/45]
English:MODULAR ACTUATOR, AND BRAKE CALLIPER COMPRISING SUCH ACTUATOR[2000/45]
French:VERIN MODULAIRE ET ETRIER DE FREIN LE COMPORTANT[2000/45]
Entry into regional phase18.07.2000National basic fee paid 
18.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
18.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/45]
15.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.2002Fee for grant paid
30.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.10.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
21.08.200003   M06   Fee paid on   17.11.2000
Cited inInternational search[XAY]WO9711287  (LUCAS IND PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,7,9,10,15,18-24,26,29-32 * page 7, line 4 - page 10, line 3; figure - * [A] 5,11-13 [Y] 25;
 [XA]US4804073  (TAIG ALISTAIR G [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,9-11,18-20,26-32 * column 2, line 1 - column 5, line 17; figures 1,6,7,9-11 * [A] 5,12,14,25;
 [XA]US5107967  (FUJITA YASUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,10,22-24,26,29-32 * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 29; figures 1,2,5 * [A] 12,13;
 [X]US4712441  (ABRAHAM WILLIAM F [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6,10,26,29-31 * column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 29 * * column 5, line 7 - column 6, line 2; figure - *;
 [XA]US4579012  (MABIE JOHN H [US], et al) [X] 1,21-24,26 * column 2, line 6 - column 4, line 10; figure - * [A] 2-4,15,18-20;
 [XA]US4867000  (LENTZ DENNIS G [US]) [X] 1,27,28 * column 5, line 7 - column 11, line 20; figures 4-10 * [A] 2,20,26;
 [XA]US2988609  (EVANS JR VERNON) [X] 1,2,10,22,23,26,29-31 * column W * [A] 3;
 [XA]GB2201655  (LICENTIA GMBH) [X] 1,2,4,8,21-23,26,29-31 * the whole document * [A] 5;
 [Y]US4685345  (GRUSS ALDER R [US]) [Y] 25 * column 3, line 68 - column 4, line 2; figure - *;
 [A]US5067826  (LEMELSON JEROME H [US]) [A] 25 * column A *
by applicantWO9603301