Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970188

EP0970188 - SOLID CULTURE MEDIUM FOR MICROORGANISMS, PROCESS FOR ITS PREPARATION, AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.05.2005
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.05.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.06.2005  [2005/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Orion Diagnostica Oy
Koivu-Mankkaan tie 6 B
02200 Espoo / FI
[2004/23]
Former [2000/40]For all designated states
Orion-Yhtymä Oyj
Orion Diagnostica, Oriontie 1
02200 Espoo / FI
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
ORION-YHTYMÄ OY
Orionintie 1
02200 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / JUSSILA, Marita
Kuusivaarantie 9
FIN-03300 Otalampi / FI
02 / TUOMPO, Helena
Otakuja 4 A 9
FIN-02150 Espoo / FI
03 / SCHEININ, Leena
Täysikuu 10 A 19
FIN-02210 Espoo / FI
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Karvinen, Leena Maria , et al
Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen Ab
Iso Roobertinkatu 4-6 A
00120 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Karvinen, Leena Maria , et al
Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 4-6 A
00120 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date98900852.914.01.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998FI00020
Priority number, dateFI1997000016315.01.1997         Original published format: FI 970163
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9831785
Date:23.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970188
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1998
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE23.07.1998
ClassificationInternational:C12N1/22
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:FESTER NÄHRBODEN FÜR MIKROORGANISMEN, VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG UND ANWENDUNG[2000/02]
English:SOLID CULTURE MEDIUM FOR MICROORGANISMS, PROCESS FOR ITS PREPARATION, AND USE[2000/02]
French:MILIEU DE CULTURE SOLIDE POUR MICRO-ORGANISMES, PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE CELUI-CI ET UTILISATION[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase23.07.1999National basic fee paid 
23.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.06.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
23.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
13.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/26]
02.02.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
05.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
29.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200508   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]JP08033486  ;
 [A]US5494823  (TAKEMOTO MASAHIRO [JP], et al);
 [A]US3360440  (WALTER HAAB, et al);
 [A]GB2300648  (ECHA MICROBIOLOGY LTD [GB])
 [X]  - FILE WPI, Derwent Accession No. 96-145944, SHINGIJUTSU JIGYODAN, "Carriers for Cell Culture - by Introducing Crosslinked Temp. Sensitive Polymer Cpd. Into Hydrogel"; & JP,A,08 033 486 (06-02-96)., & JP08033486 A 00000000