Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1015694

EP1015694 - METHOD AND DEVICE IN THE FORMING OF A LEAD-IN STRIP IN A PAPER/BOARD MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  28.03.2002
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 15.05.2002  [2002/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Metso Paper, Inc.
Fabianinkatu 9 A
00130 Helsinki / FI
[2001/43]
Former [2001/35]For all designated states
Metso Paper, Inc.
P O Box 1220
00130 Helsinki / FI
Former [2001/32]For all designated states
Valmet Corporation(Reg.No.763281)
Fabianinkatu 9 A
00130 Helsinki / FI
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
VALMET CORPORATION
Panuntie 6
00620 Helsinki / FI
Inventor(s)01 / KUHASALO, Antti
Välitie 1 as 10
FIN-40530 Jyväskylä / FI
02 / AHOKAS, Matti
Haapaheikintie 7
FIN-40420 Jyskä / FI
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Lahti, Heikki , et al
Forssén & Salomaa Oy
Yrjönkatu 30
00100 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]Lahti, Heikki , et al
Forssén & Salomaa Oy Yrjönkatu 30
00100 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date98900874.320.01.1998
[2000/27]
WO1998FI00042
Priority number, dateFI1997000038030.01.1997         Original published format: FI 970380
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9833974
Date:06.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1015694
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.1998
[2000/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE06.08.1998
ClassificationInternational:D21F7/00, D21G9/00
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/27]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM FORMEN EINES ÜBERFÜHRUNGSSTREIFENS IN EINER PAPIER/PAPPE MASCHINE[2000/27]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE IN THE FORMING OF A LEAD-IN STRIP IN A PAPER/BOARD MACHINE[2000/27]
French:PROCEDE DE FORMATION D'UNE BANDE D'ENTREE DANS UNE MACHINE A PAPIER/CARTON[2000/27]
Entry into regional phase01.07.1999National basic fee paid 
01.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
01.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.06.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
02.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/27]
15.02.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/20]
21.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
18.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]FI95612B  (VALMET PAPER MACHINERY INC [FI]);
 [X]WO9103359  (FIBRON MACHINE CORP [CA])