Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971762

EP0971762 - AN INSUFFLATOR ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  28.06.2002
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 14.08.2002  [2002/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AstraZeneca AB
151 85 Södertälje / SE
[2000/19]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Astra Aktiebolag (publ)
151 85 Södertälje / SE
Inventor(s)01 / FAGERSTRÖM, Per-Olof
Holländarhusvägen 53
S-237 33 Bjärred / SE
02 / NERBRINK, Ola
Anslagsvägen 16
S-226 47 Lund / SE
03 / HANSSON, Henri
Lärkstigen 12
S-255 91 Helsingborg / SE
04 / NILSSON EIREFELT, Marika
Bankgatan 14 C
S-223 52 Lund / SE
05 / ERJEFÄLT, Ingrid
Norrev ng 52
S-247 34 Södra Sandby / SE
[2000/09]
Former [2000/03]01 / FAGERSTRÖM, Per-Olof
Holländarhusvägen 53
S-237 33 Bjärred / SE
02 / NERBRINK, Ola
Anslagsvägen 16
S-226 47 Lund / SE
03 / HANSSON, Henri
Bäckavägen 11
S-252 85 Helsingborg / SE
04 / NILSSON EIREFELT, Marika
Bankgatan 14 C
S-223 52 Lund / SE
05 / ERJEFÄLT, Ingrid
Norrev ng 52
S-247 34 Södra Sandby / SE
Application number, filing date98901154.913.01.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998SE00037
Priority number, dateSE1997000010416.01.1997         Original published format: SE 9700104
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9831414
Date:23.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971762
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1998
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE23.07.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61M13/00
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
Extension statesLT16.08.1999
LV16.08.1999
MK16.08.1999
RO16.08.1999
SI16.08.1999
TitleGerman:INSUFFLATIONSEINRICHTUNG[2000/03]
English:AN INSUFFLATOR ASSEMBLY[2000/03]
French:ENSEMBLE D'INSUFFLATION[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase16.08.1999National basic fee paid 
16.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
16.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.06.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
16.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
14.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.06.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]US2722935  (THOMPSON ROBERT E, et al);
 [A]US5542412  (CENTURY THEODORE J [US]);
 [A]US5273531  (KNOEPFLER DENNIS J [US])
by applicantUS2722935
 US5542412
 US5273531