Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1044240

EP1044240 - PIPE, ESPECIALLY A PRESSURE PIPE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.02.2003
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.04.2003  [2003/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Borealis GmbH
Danubiastrasse 21-25
2323 Schwechat-Mannswörth / AT
[2002/39]
Former [2000/42]For all designated states
PCD-Polymere Gesellschaft m.b.H.
Danubiastrasse 21-25
A-2323 Schwechat-Mannswörth / AT
Inventor(s)01 / KONRAD, Roland
Blütenstrasse 21/25
A-4040 Linz / AT
02 / EBNER, Karl
Johann-Strauss-Strasse 11
A-4540 Bad Hall / AT
03 / BERNREITNER, Klaus
Zaubertalstrasse 1
A-4010 Linz / AT
04 / WOLFSCHWENGER, Johannes
Weichstetten 98
A-4491 Niederneukirchen / AT
[2000/42]
Representative(s)Hübscher, Helmut
Patentanwaltskanzlei Hübscher
Postfach 411
4010 Linz / AT
[N/P]
Former [2000/42]Hübscher, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Gerhard Hübscher Dipl.-Ing. Helmut Hübscher Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Hübscher Spittelwiese 7
4020 Linz / AT
Application number, filing date98901242.204.02.1998
[2000/42]
WO1998AT00023
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9940151
Date:12.08.1999
Language:DE
[1999/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1044240
Date:18.10.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999
[2000/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1044240
Date:10.04.2002
Language:DE
[2002/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08K5/20, F16L9/12
[2000/42]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   PT,   SE [2000/42]
TitleGerman:ROHR, INSBESONDERE DRUCKROHR[2000/42]
English:PIPE, ESPECIALLY A PRESSURE PIPE[2000/42]
French:TUYAU, EN PARTICULIER TUYAU POUR FLUIDE SOUS PRESSION[2000/42]
Entry into regional phase16.08.2000National basic fee paid 
16.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
16.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/42]
24.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.10.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.12.2001Fee for grant paid
31.12.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
16.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[YD]EP0557121  (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [YD] 1,2 * page 2, line 24 - page 10, line 1 *;
 [Y]JPH08100088  ;
 [Y]JPH05255551  ;
 [Y]JPH05170932  ;
 [Y]EP0177961  (DANUBIA PETROCHEMIE [AT]) [Y] 1,2 * page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 6, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960830), vol. 096, no. 008, [Y] 1,2 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940113), vol. 018, no. 019, Database accession no. (C - 1152), [Y] 1,2 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931022), vol. 017, no. 582, Database accession no. (C - 1123), [Y] 1,2 * abstract *