EP1021423 - MACROCYCLIC INHIBITORS OF MATRIX METALLOPROTEINASES AND TNF$g(a) SECRETION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.10.2003 [2003/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, IL 60064-3500 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/30] | For all designated states Abbott Laboratories Chad 0377/AP6D-2, 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, Illinois 60064-3500 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIDSEN, Steven, K. 1002 Gracewood Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | 02 /
STEINMAN, Douglas, H. 7001 Foster Street Morton Grove, IL 60053 / US | 03 /
SHEPPARD, George, S. 300 Laurel Avenue Wilmette, IL 60091 / US | 04 /
XU, Lianhong 640 Hobart Avenue San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | 05 /
HOLMS, James, H. 1239 Pine Grove Street Gurnee, IL 60031 / US | 06 /
GUO, Yan 7193 Presidential Drive Gurnee, IL 60031 / US | 07 /
FLORJANCIC, Alan, Scott 2764 Whitetail Circle Lafayette, CO 80026 / US | 08 /
SIUMMERS, James, B. 1955 St. Andrews Drive Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | 09 /
MICHAELIDES, Michael, R. 4452 W.Gavin Lane Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | [2000/30] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/30] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98901696.9 | 07.01.1998 | [2000/30] | WO1998US00144 | Priority number, date | US19970782016 | 07.01.1997 Original published format: US 782016 | [2000/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9830551 | Date: | 16.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1021423 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07D267/00, C07D225/06, C07D245/02, C07D245/06, C07D255/02, C07D413/04, C07D413/06, C07D417/06, C07D487/08, C07K5/078, A61K31/55, A61K38/05 | [2000/30] | CPC: |
C07D413/04 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
C07D225/06 (EP);
C07D245/02 (EP);
C07D245/06 (EP);
C07D267/00 (EP);
C07D413/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/30] | Title | German: | MACROCYCLISCHE INHIBITORE VON MATRIX-METALLOPROTEINASE UND TNF-ALPHA-SEKRETION | [2000/30] | English: | MACROCYCLIC INHIBITORS OF MATRIX METALLOPROTEINASES AND TNF$g(a) SECRETION | [2000/30] | French: | INHIBITEURS MACROCYCLIQUES DE METALLOPROTEINASES MATRICIELLES ET DE SECRETION DE FNT$g(a) | [2000/30] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.07.1999 | Examination requested [2000/30] | 05.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/43] | 21.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9213831 (BRITISH BIO TECHNOLOGY [GB]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9718207 (DU PONT MERCK PHARMA [US]) [PX] 1-13 * the whole document * |