Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0983444

EP0983444 - FREE RUNNING PREVAILING TORQUE NUT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.08.2003
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huck International, Inc.
3724 E. Columbia Street Tucson
AZ 85714 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/10]For all designated states
Huck International, Inc.
3724 E. Columbia Street
Tucson, AZ 85714 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SADRI, Shahriar, M.
705 Avenida Azor
San Clemente, CA 92672 / US
02 / WANG, Hai-Tao
17955 Boxwood Circle
Fountain Valley, CA 92708-5102 / US
03 / HURD, Ramon, L.
8857 Cardinal Avenue
Fountain Valley, CA 92708 / US
[2000/10]
Representative(s)Price, Nigel John King
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/10]Price, Nigel John King
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date98901707.405.01.1998
[2000/10]
WO1998US00231
Priority number, dateUS1997083823516.04.1997         Original published format: US 838235
[2000/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9846892
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0983444
Date:08.03.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998
[2000/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0983444
Date:02.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:F16B31/00, F16B37/08, F16B39/36, F16B31/02
[2000/27]
Former International [2000/10]F16B31/00, F16B37/08, F16B39/36
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/10]
TitleGerman:FREILAUFENDE MUTTER MIT DREHSICHERUNGSMOMENT[2000/10]
English:FREE RUNNING PREVAILING TORQUE NUT[2000/10]
French:ECROU LIBRE A COUPLE DOMINANT[2000/10]
Entry into regional phase02.11.1999National basic fee paid 
02.11.1999Search fee paid 
02.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
02.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
02.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/10]
02.01.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
11.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
28.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.07.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
24.07.2002Fee for grant paid
24.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/39]
Request for further processing for:24.07.2002Request for further processing filed
24.07.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.08.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
10.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.10.2002
BE02.10.2002
CH02.10.2002
FI02.10.2002
GR02.10.2002
IT02.10.2002
LI02.10.2002
NL02.10.2002
DK02.01.2003
PT02.01.2003
SE02.01.2003
LU05.01.2003
IE06.01.2003
MC31.01.2003
ES29.04.2003
[2008/15]
Former [2007/17]AT02.10.2002
BE02.10.2002
CH02.10.2002
FI02.10.2002
GR02.10.2002
LI02.10.2002
NL02.10.2002
DK02.01.2003
PT02.01.2003
SE02.01.2003
LU05.01.2003
IE06.01.2003
MC31.01.2003
ES29.04.2003
Former [2005/02]AT02.10.2002
BE02.10.2002
CH02.10.2002
FI02.10.2002
GR02.10.2002
LI02.10.2002
NL02.10.2002
PT02.01.2003
SE02.01.2003
LU05.01.2003
IE06.01.2003
MC31.01.2003
ES29.04.2003
Former [2004/39]AT02.10.2002
BE02.10.2002
CH02.10.2002
FI02.10.2002
GR02.10.2002
LI02.10.2002
NL02.10.2002
PT02.01.2003
SE02.01.2003
LU05.01.2003
IE06.01.2003
ES29.04.2003
Former [2004/15]AT02.10.2002
BE02.10.2002
CH02.10.2002
FI02.10.2002
GR02.10.2002
LI02.10.2002
NL02.10.2002
PT02.01.2003
SE02.01.2003
IE06.01.2003
ES29.04.2003
Former [2004/04]AT02.10.2002
BE02.10.2002
CH02.10.2002
FI02.10.2002
GR02.10.2002
LI02.10.2002
NL02.10.2002
PT02.01.2003
SE02.01.2003
ES29.04.2003
Former [2003/51]AT02.10.2002
BE02.10.2002
CH02.10.2002
FI02.10.2002
GR02.10.2002
LI02.10.2002
NL02.10.2002
PT02.01.2003
SE02.01.2003
Former [2003/43]AT02.10.2002
CH02.10.2002
FI02.10.2002
GR02.10.2002
LI02.10.2002
NL02.10.2002
PT02.01.2003
SE02.01.2003
Former [2003/39]AT02.10.2002
CH02.10.2002
GR02.10.2002
LI02.10.2002
NL02.10.2002
PT02.01.2003
SE02.01.2003
Former [2003/37]AT02.10.2002
GR02.10.2002
NL02.10.2002
PT02.01.2003
SE02.01.2003
Former [2003/31]GR02.10.2002
NL02.10.2002
PT02.01.2003
SE02.01.2003
Former [2003/30]NL02.10.2002
PT02.01.2003
SE02.01.2003
Former [2003/29]PT02.01.2003
SE02.01.2003
Former [2003/27]SE02.01.2003
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2380994  (PUMMILL EDWIN W) [Y] 1,6,7,10 * figures 1-3 *;
 [Y]US2605804  (WOODLING GEORGE V) [Y] 1,6,7,10 * figure 4 *;
 [Y]US4729703  (SATO TOSHIYUKI [JP]) [Y] 1,6,7,10 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US3225809  (PEAK SR GEORGE P) [Y] 1,6,7,10 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2605804  (WOODLING GEORGE V);
 [A]US3225809  (PEAK SR GEORGE P);
 [A]US4729703  (SATO TOSHIYUKI [JP])