EP0965238 - SUBSCRIBER IDENTITY MODULE, MOBILE STATION AND METHOD FOR PERFORMING A SMART CARD FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/51] | SUBSCRIBER IDENTITY MODULE MOBILE STATION AND METHOD FOR PERFORMING A SMART CARD FUNCTION | ||
[2003/47] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TeliaSonera Finland Oyj Teollisuuskatu 15 00510 Helsinki / FI | [2004/10] |
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states Sonera Oyj Teollisuuskatu 15 00510 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [1999/51] | For all designated states Sonera Oy Sturenkatu 16 00510 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEHMUS, Marja-Leena Iltaruskontie 3 B 10 FIN-02120 Espoo / FI | 02 /
OKSMAN, Salla Ohralantie 7 FIN-00970 Helsinki / FI | 03 /
ESKOLA, Susanna Jalkamyllyntie 4 FIN-00920 Helsinki / FI | 04 /
LINKOLA, Janne Kuusikallionkuja 4 F 43 FIN-02210 Espoo / FI | [1999/51] | Representative(s) | Simmelvuo, Markku Kalevi, et al Papula Oy ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | Simmelvuo, Markku Kalevi, et al Papula Rein Lahtela Oy, P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 98901996.3 | 27.01.1998 | [1999/51] | WO1998FI00080 | Priority number, date | FI19970000339 | 27.01.1997 Original published format: FI 970339 | [1999/51] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9833343 | Date: | 30.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0965238 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0965238 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 30.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/32, G07F7/08, G06K19/073 | [1999/51] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP,US);
G06Q20/32 (US);
G06Q20/3255 (EP,US);
G06Q20/327 (EP,US);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06Q20/357 (EP,US);
G06Q20/363 (EP,US);
G07F7/0866 (EP,US);
H04W76/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/51] | Title | German: | TEILNEHMERIDENTIFIKATIONSMODUL, MOBILSTATION UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUSFÜHREN EINER CHIPKARTENFUNKTION | [2003/47] | English: | SUBSCRIBER IDENTITY MODULE, MOBILE STATION AND METHOD FOR PERFORMING A SMART CARD FUNCTION | [2003/47] | French: | MODULE D'IDENTIFICATION D'ABONNE, STATION MOBILE ET PROCEDE POUR REALISER UNE FONCTION DE CARTE A PUCE | [2003/47] |
Former [1999/51] | TEILNEHMERIDENTIFIKATIONSMODULE FÜR EINE MOBILSTATION UND VERFAHREN ZUR | ||
Former [1999/51] | SUBSCRIBER IDENTITY MODULE MOBILE STATION AND METHOD FOR PERFORMING A SMART CARD FUNCTION | ||
Former [1999/51] | STATION MOBILE AVEC MODULE D'IDENTIFICATION D'ABONNE ET PROCEDE POUR REALISER UNE FONCTION DE CARTE A PUCE | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.1998 | Translation filed | 11.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 11.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/51] | 02.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.01.2005
01.03.2005
ADMISSIBLE Swisscom Mobile AG Waldeggstrasse 51 3097 Liebefeld / CH Opponent's representative P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Avenue J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.01.2005
01.03.2005
ADMISSIBLE Swisscom Mobile AG Waldeggstrasse 51 3097 Liebefeld / CH Opponent's representative P&TS Patents & Technology Surveys SA Case Postale 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [2005/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.01.2005
01.03.2005
ADMISSIBLE Swisscom Mobile AG 3050 Bern / CH Opponent's representative P&TS Patents & Technology Surveys SA Rue des Terreaux 7 P.O.Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | 08.03.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.07.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 27.11.2008 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 28.04.2004 | LU | 27.01.2005 | MC | 31.01.2005 | AT | 27.01.2006 | GB | 27.01.2006 | IE | 27.01.2006 | ES | 28.01.2006 | SE | 28.01.2006 | BE | 31.01.2006 | CH | 31.01.2006 | DK | 31.01.2006 | FR | 31.01.2006 | LI | 31.01.2006 | PT | 27.07.2006 | DE | 01.08.2006 | NL | 01.08.2006 | GR | 02.08.2006 | IT | 27.01.2007 | [2010/05] |
Former [2008/48] | FI | 28.04.2004 | |
LU | 27.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
AT | 27.01.2006 | ||
GB | 27.01.2006 | ||
IE | 27.01.2006 | ||
ES | 28.01.2006 | ||
SE | 28.01.2006 | ||
BE | 31.01.2006 | ||
CH | 31.01.2006 | ||
DK | 31.01.2006 | ||
FR | 31.01.2006 | ||
LI | 31.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.07.2006 | ||
DE | 01.08.2006 | ||
NL | 01.08.2006 | ||
GR | 02.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/15] | FI | 28.04.2004 | |
LU | 27.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
AT | 27.01.2006 | ||
GB | 27.01.2006 | ||
IE | 27.01.2006 | ||
ES | 28.01.2006 | ||
SE | 28.01.2006 | ||
BE | 31.01.2006 | ||
CH | 31.01.2006 | ||
DK | 31.01.2006 | ||
FR | 31.01.2006 | ||
LI | 31.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.07.2006 | ||
DE | 01.08.2006 | ||
NL | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/30] | FI | 28.04.2004 | |
LU | 27.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
AT | 27.01.2006 | ||
GB | 27.01.2006 | ||
IE | 27.01.2006 | ||
SE | 28.01.2006 | ||
BE | 31.01.2006 | ||
CH | 31.01.2006 | ||
DK | 31.01.2006 | ||
FR | 31.01.2006 | ||
LI | 31.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.07.2006 | ||
DE | 01.08.2006 | ||
NL | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | FI | 28.04.2004 | |
LU | 27.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
AT | 27.01.2006 | ||
GB | 27.01.2006 | ||
IE | 27.01.2006 | ||
SE | 28.01.2006 | ||
BE | 31.01.2006 | ||
CH | 31.01.2006 | ||
DK | 31.01.2006 | ||
LI | 31.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.07.2006 | ||
DE | 01.08.2006 | ||
NL | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/17] | FI | 28.04.2004 | |
LU | 27.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
AT | 27.01.2006 | ||
GB | 27.01.2006 | ||
IE | 27.01.2006 | ||
SE | 28.01.2006 | ||
BE | 31.01.2006 | ||
CH | 31.01.2006 | ||
DK | 31.01.2006 | ||
LI | 31.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.07.2006 | ||
DE | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | FI | 28.04.2004 | |
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
AT | 27.01.2006 | ||
IE | 27.01.2006 | ||
SE | 28.01.2006 | ||
CH | 31.01.2006 | ||
LI | 31.01.2006 | ||
DE | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | FI | 28.04.2004 | |
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
AT | 27.01.2006 | ||
IE | 27.01.2006 | ||
SE | 28.01.2006 | ||
DE | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | FI | 28.04.2004 | |
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
IE | 27.01.2006 | ||
SE | 28.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 28.04.2004 | |
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 28.04.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9411849 (VATANEN HARRI TAPANI [FI]); | [A]US5353328 (JOKIMIES MATTI [FI]); | [AP]FR2740291 (SAGEM [FR]); | [AP]WO9741499 (MARTINEZ JERRY R [US]); | [AP]WO9744762 (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR], et al) |