Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973707

EP0973707 - METHOD FOR ELIMINATING INHIBITORS OF POLYMERISATION OF MONOMER MIXTURES USING AN ALUMINA WITH OPTIMISED FORM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.03.2002
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.03.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.04.2002  [2002/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RHODIA CHIMIE
25, quai Paul Doumer
92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / NEDEZ, Christophe
8, rue Maurice Fournier
F-30340 Salindres / FR
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Ducreux, Marie
Rhodia Services
Propriété Industrielle
25, Quai Paul Doumer
92408 Courbevoie Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Ducreux Bertrand, Marie
Rhodia Services Propriété Industrielle, 25, Quai Paul Doumer
92408 Courbevoie Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date98902068.013.01.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998FR00053
Priority number, dateFR1997000062522.01.1997         Original published format: FR 9700625
[2000/04]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9832717
Date:30.07.1998
Language:FR
[1998/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973707
Date:26.01.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.1998
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.07.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07B63/00, C07C7/12
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:ENTFERNUNG VON POLYMERISIERUNGSINHIBITOREN AUS MISCHUNGEN VON MONOMEREN MITTELS OPTIMIERTEN ALUMINIUMOXIDS[2000/04]
English:METHOD FOR ELIMINATING INHIBITORS OF POLYMERISATION OF MONOMER MIXTURES USING AN ALUMINA WITH OPTIMISED FORM[2000/04]
French:PROCEDE D'ELIMINATION D'INHIBITEURS DE POLYMERISATION DE MELANGES DE MONOMERES A L'AIDE D'UNE ALUMINE DE FORME OPTIMISEE[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase12.07.1999National basic fee paid 
12.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
12.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
26.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
06.10.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/16]
13.11.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
29.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]US3240830  (DYE ROBERT F) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 31 - column 4, line 40 *;
 [A]GB2248627  (ENICHEM POLIMERI [IT]) [A] 1-10 * example -; claim - *;
 [A]FR1361512  (ELECTROCHIMIE SOC) [A] 1-10 * page 2, column 1, line 7 - line 20; examples 1-8,11,12 *