Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0967870

EP0967870 - HERBICIDAL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.01.2005
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.01.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.03.2005  [2005/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited
27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8260 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/01]For all designated states
Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited
27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8260 / JP
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MITO, Nobuaki
3-12-6, Minami-machi Kanokodai
Kita-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-1514 / JP
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/03]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Postfach 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
Former [2000/01]von Uexküll Güldenband- Menzel, Alexa
Vossius & Partner, Postfach 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
Application number, filing date98902198.513.02.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998JP00575
Priority number, dateJP1997003239417.02.1997         Original published format: JP 3239497
JP1997003239617.02.1997         Original published format: JP 3239697
JP1997003240217.02.1997         Original published format: JP 3240297
JP1997003240417.02.1997         Original published format: JP 3240497
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9835555
Date:20.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0967870
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.1998
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search reportEP20.08.1998
ClassificationInternational:A01N43/58, // (A01N43/58, 43:70, 43:40, 39:04, 37:40)
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [2000/01]
TitleGerman:HERBIZIDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2000/01]
English:HERBICIDAL COMPOSITION[2000/01]
French:COMPOSITION HERBICIDE[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase16.09.1999National basic fee paid 
16.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
16.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
07.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/11]
14.10.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
01.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XP]WO9707104  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al) [XP] 1-67 * page 59 - page 61 * * page 65, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * page 70; example 5 * * page 77; example 16 *