Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1020533

EP1020533 - METHOD FOR JUDGING THE POSSIBILITY OF THE ONSET OF SHEEP LEUKEMIA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.10.2005
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.10.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.11.2005  [2005/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RIKEN
2-1, Hirosawa
Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0198 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
Riken
2-1, Hirosawa
Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0198 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / AIDA, Yoko The Inst. of Physical and Chemical Res.
Tsukuba L. Science Cntr 1-1, Koyadai 3-chome
Tsukkuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0074 / JP
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Godemeyer, Thomas
polypatent Postfach 1107
51482 Overath / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]Godemeyer, Thomas, Dr.
Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 1107
51482 Overath / DE
Application number, filing date98902237.116.02.1998
[2000/29]
WO1998JP00620
Priority number, dateJP1997003178717.02.1997         Original published format: JP 3178797
[2000/29]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9836092
Date:20.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1020533
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.1998
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1020533
Date:08.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP20.08.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68, C12Q1/70
[2002/32]
Former International [2000/29]C12Q1/68
Designated contracting statesBE,   GB [2000/29]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEURTEILUNG DER MÖGLICHKEIT DES EINTRITTS DER SCHAFLEUKÄMIE[2000/29]
English:METHOD FOR JUDGING THE POSSIBILITY OF THE ONSET OF SHEEP LEUKEMIA[2000/29]
French:PROCEDE DE DETERMINATION DE LA POSSIBILITE DE SURVENUE DE LA LEUCEMIE DU MOUTON[2000/29]
Entry into regional phase25.08.1999Translation filed 
14.09.1999National basic fee paid 
14.09.1999Search fee paid 
14.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
14.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.02.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
14.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/29]
25.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
26.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.2004Fee for grant paid
29.09.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9319204  (UNIV ILLINOIS [US]) [Y] 1-7 * page 10 - page 11; claims 1-48 *;
 [E]EP0960947  (RIKAGAKU KENKYUSHO [JP]) [E] 5,6 * claim 10 *;
 [Y]  XU A ET AL, "Polymorphism in BoLA-DRB3 exon 2 correlates with resistance to persistent lymphocytosis caused by bovine leukemia virus", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (199312), vol. 151, no. 12, pages 6977 - 85, XP002202245 [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *
 [A]  AIDA Y ET AL, "IDENTIFICATION OF A NEW BOVINE MHC CLASS II DRB ALLELE BY NUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCING AND AN ANALYSIS OF PHYLOGENETIC RELATIONSHIPS", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (19950426), vol. 209, no. 3, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 981 - 988, XP002925821

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1995.1594
International search[Y]  - SCHWAIGER F W, ET AL., "INTERDEPENDENT MHC-DRB EXON-PLUS-INTRON EVOLUTION IN ARTIODACTYLS", MOLECULAR BIOLOGY AND EVOLUTION., THE UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO PRESS., US, US, (19940101), vol. 11, no. 02, ISSN 0737-4038, pages 239 - 249, XP002917874
 [Y]  - AIDA Y, ET AL., "FURTHER PHENOTYPIC CHARACTERIZATION OF TARGET CELLS FOR BOVINE LEUKEMIA VIRUS EXPERIMENTAL INFECTION IN SHEEP", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF VETERINARY RESEARCH., American Veterinary Medicine Association, US, US, (19891101), vol. 50, no. 11, ISSN 0002-9645, pages 1946 - 1951, XP002917875