Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1044015

EP1044015 - FORMULATIONS FOR AMYLIN AGONIST PEPTIDES WITH INSULIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/42]FORMULATIONS FOR AMYLIN AGONIST PEPTIDES
[2008/20]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.08.2009
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.06.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR, LU
published on 20.07.2011  [2011/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
9360 Towne Centre Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2008/41]
Former [2007/44]For all designated states
AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
9360 Towne Centre Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
Former [2000/42]For all designated states
AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
9373 Towne Centre Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
Inventor(s)01 / L'ITALIAN, James
15792 Caminito Cantaras
Del Mar, CA 92014 / US
02 / MUSUNURI, Shankar
23 Linwood Drive
Exton, PA 19341 / US
03 / RUBY, Cale
13187 Sundance Avenue
San Diego, CA 92129 / US
 [2001/14]
Former [2000/42]01 / L'ITALIAN, James
13292 Norcroft Road
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
02 / MUSUNURI, Shankar
23 Linwood Drive
Exton, PA 19341 / US
03 / RUBY, Cale
13187 Sundance Avenue
San Diego, CA 92129 / US
Representative(s)von Menges, Albrecht , et al
Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/44]von Menges, Albrecht , et al
Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Former [2007/42]von Menges, Albrecht
Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Former [2000/42]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Application number, filing date98902423.709.01.1998
[2000/42]
WO1998US00288
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9934822
Date:15.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1044015
Date:18.10.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.1999
[2000/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1044015
Date:08.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.07.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/28, A61P3/10
[2008/20]
Former International [2000/42]A61K38/28
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/42]
TitleGerman:FORMULIERUNGEN FÜR AMYLIN PEPTIDAGONISTEN MIT INSULIN[2008/20]
English:FORMULATIONS FOR AMYLIN AGONIST PEPTIDES WITH INSULIN[2008/20]
French:FORMULATIONS DE PEPTIDES AGONISTES D'AMYLINE AVEC D'INSULINE[2008/20]
Former [2000/42]FORMULIERUNG FÜR AMYLIN PEPTIDAGONISTEN
Former [2000/42]FORMULATIONS FOR AMYLIN AGONIST PEPTIDES
Former [2000/42]FORMULATIONS DE PEPTIDES AGONISTES D'AMYLINE
Entry into regional phase06.08.1999National basic fee paid 
06.08.1999Search fee paid 
06.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
06.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
06.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/42]
09.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.04.2008Date of oral proceedings
23.04.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.08.2008Fee for grant paid
22.08.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.07.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
12.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
12.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
05.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
08.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.10.2008
BE08.10.2008
FI08.10.2008
GR09.01.2009
IE09.01.2009
LU09.01.2009
MC31.01.2009
PT17.02.2009
[2011/25]
Former [2010/07]AT08.10.2008
BE08.10.2008
FI08.10.2008
IE09.01.2009
MC31.01.2009
PT17.02.2009
Former [2010/05]AT08.10.2008
BE08.10.2008
FI08.10.2008
MC31.01.2009
PT17.02.2009
Former [2009/32]AT08.10.2008
BE08.10.2008
FI08.10.2008
PT17.02.2009
Former [2009/30]AT08.10.2008
FI08.10.2008
PT17.02.2009
Documents cited:Search[X]US5508260  (BEAUMONT KEVIN [US], et al) [X] 16,17 * column 12, line 29 - line 57 *;
 [A]WO9640220  (AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [A] * page 19 *;
 [E]WO9855144  (AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [E] 1-17,19-31 * page 25, line 15 - page 26, line 26 *;
 [A]  DESHMUKH T ET AL, "Simulated patient-use patterns and temperature excursion studies on pramlintide injection final drug product.", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, Annual Meeting of the American Association of Pharmaceutical Scientists; Boston, Massachusetts, USA; 2-6 November 1997, (199711), vol. 14, no. 11 suppl., pages S469 - S470, XP000990748 [A] * abstract 3022 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1012111116002
 [T]  HEKMAN C M ET AL, "Isolation and identification of cyclic imide and deamidation products in heat stressed pramlintide injection drug product.", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL & BIOMEDICAL ANALYSIS, (1999), vol. 20, no. 5, pages 763 - 772, XP000990756

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0731-7085(99)00075-8
 [T]  KENLEY R A ET AL, "Kinetics of pramlintide degradation in aqueous solution as a function of temperature and pH", AAPS PHARMSCITECH, vol. 1, no. 2 article 7, (20000421), URL: http://www.aapspharmaceutica.com/scientificjournals/pharmscitech/volume1issue2/105/manuscript.pdf, (20010326), XP002164105
 [T]  KENLEY R A ET AL, "Pramlintide injection drug product robustness studies", AAPS PHARMSCITECH, vol. 1, no. 2 article 8, (20000421), URL: http://www.aapspharmaceutica.com/scientificjournals/pharmscitech/volume1issue2/106/manuscript.pdf, (20010326), XP002164106
International search[Y]US4654324  (CHANCE RONALD E [US], et al);
 [Y]WO9310146  (AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]);
 [Y]  - KOLTERMAN O. G., ET AL., "EFFECT OF 14 DAYS' SUBCUTANEOUS ADMINISTRATION OF THE HUMAN AMYLIN ANALOGUE, PRAMLINTIDE (AC137), ON AN INTRAVENOUS INSULIN CHALLENGE AND RESPONSE TO A STANDARD LIQUID MEAL IN PATIENTS WITH IDDM.", DIABETOLOGIA, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, BERLIN, DE, (19960401), vol. 39., no. 04., doi:10.1007/BF00400683, ISSN 0012-186X, pages 492 - 499., XP002912429

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00400683
 [Y]  - MLODZIK H., "ONCOLOGIC, ENDOCRINE & METABOLIC. ANTIDIABETICS: ANALYSIS OF PATENTING 1990 - 1994.", EXPERT OPINION ON THERAPEUTIC PATENTS., Informa Healthcare, GB, GB, (19950101), vol. 05., no. 07., doi:10.1517/13543776.5.7.685, ISSN 1354-3776, pages 685 - 688., XP002912430

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543776.5.7.685
 [Y]  - AVIS K. E., "PARENTERAL PREPARATIONS.", REMINGTON'S PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, MACK PUBLISHING CO., US, US, (19900101), pages 1545 - 1553., XP002912431
 [Y]  - "INSULIN DELIVERY DEVICES.", PHYSICIAN'S DESK REFERENCE, XX, XX, XX, (19960101), pages 1797 - 1800., XP002912432
Examination   REDALIEU ET AL, "PHARMACOKINETIC EFFECTS OF SYRINGE MIXING PRAMLINTIDE, ISOPHANE INSULIN, AND SOLUBLE INSULIN", DIABETOLOGIA., DEBERLIN, (1997), vol. 40, no. 1, page 356, XP000990750