Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0967937

EP0967937 - KINETIC STENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.05.2005
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.05.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.06.2005  [2005/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
APPLIED MEDICAL RESOURCES CORPORATION
22872 Avenida Empresa
Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/15]For all designated states
Applied Medical Resources Corporation
22872 Avenida Empressa
Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688 / US
Former [2002/02]For all designated states
Applied Medical Resources Corporation
22782 Avenida Empressa
Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688 / US
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
APPLIED MEDICAL RESOURCES CORPORATION
26051 Merit Circle No. 103
Laguna Hills, CA 92653 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HART, Charles, C.
8252 Mandeville
Huntington Beach, CA 92646 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Enskat, Michael Antony Frank
Saunders & Dolleymore LLP
9 Rickmansworth Road
Watford
WD18 0JU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Enskat, Michael Antony Frank
Saunders & Dolleymore, 9, Rickmansworth Road
Watford, Hertfordshire WD1 7HE / GB
Application number, filing date98902429.409.01.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998US00313
Priority number, dateUS1997080633726.02.1997         Original published format: US 806337
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9837834
Date:03.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0967937
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1998
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.09.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/06
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/01]
TitleGerman:KINETISCHER STENT[2000/01]
English:KINETIC STENT[2000/01]
French:EXTENSEUR CINETIQUE[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase27.08.1999National basic fee paid 
27.08.1999Search fee paid 
27.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
27.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
27.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
16.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/26]
28.01.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
28.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
27.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200508   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[XP]US5667486  (MIKULICH MICHAEL A [CH], et al);
 [X]US4655771  (WALLSTEN HANS I [CH]);
 [X]US5041093  (CHU MICHAEL S H [US])
Examination US5575818