Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977735

EP0977735 - VITRONECTIN RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.01.2004
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.04.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 02.06.2004  [2004/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION
One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia
Pennsylvania 19103 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/13]For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION
One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929
Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION
One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929
Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MILLER, William, H.
333 Fell Lane
Schwenksville, PA 19473 / US
02 / BONDINELL, William, E.
1512 Franklin Lane
Wayne, PA 19087 / US
03 / KU, Thomas, Wen, Fu
1413 Southwind Way
Dresher, PA 19025 / US
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Valentine, Jill Barbara , et al
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/01]Valentine, Jill Barbara , et al
GlaxoSmithKline Services Unlimited Corporate Intellectual Property 980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Former [2000/06]Garrett, Michael , et al
SmithKline Beecham, Corporate Intellectual Property, Two New Horizons Court
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB
Application number, filing date98902477.308.01.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998US00490
Priority number, dateUS19970034026P08.01.1997         Original published format: US 34026 P
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9830542
Date:16.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0977735
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.1998
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0977735
Date:26.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US16.07.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07D213/02, A61K31/44, C07D213/75, C07C69/734, C07C69/738
[2000/14]
Former International [2000/06]C07D213/02, A61K31/44
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
Extension statesRO13.07.1999
SI13.07.1999
TitleGerman:ANTAGONISTEN DES VITRONECTIN-REZEPTORS[2000/06]
English:VITRONECTIN RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS[2000/06]
French:ANTAGONISTES DU RECEPTEUR DE VITRONECTINE[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase13.07.1999National basic fee paid 
13.07.1999Search fee paid 
13.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
13.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
13.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
06.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.11.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
25.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
22.08.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
12.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.12.2002Fee for grant paid
16.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.12.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/12]
Request for further processing for:24.01.2002Request for further processing filed
24.01.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
21.02.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
05.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
10.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
09.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.03.2003
CH26.03.2003
FI26.03.2003
GR26.03.2003
LI26.03.2003
NL26.03.2003
DK26.06.2003
PT26.06.2003
SE26.06.2003
[2004/23]
Former [2004/01]AT26.03.2003
CH26.03.2003
FI26.03.2003
GR26.03.2003
LI26.03.2003
NL26.03.2003
PT26.06.2003
SE26.06.2003
Former [2003/50]AT26.03.2003
FI26.03.2003
GR26.03.2003
SE26.06.2003
Former [2003/47]AT26.03.2003
FI26.03.2003
GR26.03.2003
Former [2003/46]FI26.03.2003
GR26.03.2003
Former [2003/41]FI26.03.2003
Documents cited:Search[E]WO9915508  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [E] 1-14 * see general formula, Schemes II and III, page 6, lines 27-28 and examples *;
 [A]US3906040  (VINCENT MICHEL, et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5302602  (OSHIMA ETSUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [PA]WO9724124  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [PA] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [E]WO9905107  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [E] 1-14 * the whole document *
International search[AP]WO9701540  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al)