blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0970108

EP0970108 - SECRETED PROTEINS AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  20.06.2003
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 06.08.2003  [2003/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Genetics Institute, LLC
87 Cambridge Park Drive
Cambridge, MA 02140 / US
[2002/26]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
GENETICS INSTITUTE, INC.
87 Cambridge Park Drive
Cambridge, Massachusetts 02140 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JACOBS, Kenneth
151 Beaumont Avenue
Newton, MA 02160 / US
02 / MCCOY, John, M.
56 Howard Street
Reading, MA 01867 / US
03 / LAVALLIE, Edward, R.
90 Green Meadow Drive
Tewksbury, MA 01876 / US
04 / RACIE, Lisa, A.
124 School Street
Acton, MA 01720 / US
05 / MERBERG, David
2 Orchard Drive
Acton, MA 01720 / US
06 / TREACY, Maurice
93 Walcott Road
Chestnut Hill, MA 02167 / US
07 / SPAULDING, Vikki
11 Meadowbank Road
Billerica, MA 01821 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Frohwitter, Bernhard, et al
Frohwitter
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Possartstrasse 20
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Frohwitter, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Possartstrasse 20
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date98902494.809.01.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998US00537
Priority number, dateUS1997078089009.01.1997         Original published format: US 780890
US1997086451728.05.1997         Original published format: US 864517
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO9830584
Date:16.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/28]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0970108
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.09.1998
ClassificationIPC:C07K14/00, C07K14/705
[2000/02]
CPC:
C07K14/47 (EP); A61P29/00 (EP); A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP); A61P7/00 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:SEKRETIERTE PROTEINE UND DAFÜR KODIERENDE POLYNUKLEINSÄURE[2000/02]
English:SECRETED PROTEINS AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING THEM[2000/02]
French:PROTEINES SECRETEES ET POLYNUCLEOTIDES LES CODANT[2000/02]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase14.07.1999National basic fee paid 
14.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
14.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.07.2000Examination requested  [2001/14]
10.06.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
05.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
10.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9600289  (DOHENY EYE INSTITUTE) [A] * abstract *;
 [A]WO9414960  (DOHENY EYE INSTITUTE) [A] * abstract *
 [XP]  - Database EMBL, EMBO Heidelberg, DE AC: AF029343 DT: 14-Nov-1997 (last created) DE: Homo sapiens protocadherin 68 (PCH68) mRNA, complete cds. RA: Jin P., Xu H., Israel D., XP002065563 [XP] 1-10,13-26 * abstract *
 [A]  - SKARNES W.C. ET AL., "Capturing genes encoding membrane and secreted proteins important for mouse development", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, WASHINGTON US, (199507), vol. 92, pages 6592 - 6596, XP002065560 [A] * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.92.14.6592
 [A]  - KLEIN R.D. ET AL., "Selection for genes encoding secreted proteins and receptors", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, WASHINGTON US, (199607), vol. 93, pages 7108 - 7113, XP002065561

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.14.7108
 [A]  - TASHIRO K. ET AL., "Signal sequence trap: a cloning srategy for secreted proteins and type I membrane proteins", SCIENCE, LANCASTER, PA US, (19930730), vol. 261, pages 600 - 603, XP000673204

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.8342023
 [AP]  - JACOBS A.K. ET AL., "A genetic selection for isolating cDNAs encoding secreted proteins", GENE., AMSTERDAM NL, (19971001), vol. 198, pages 289 - 296, XP002045919

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-1119(97)00330-2
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.