Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0960349

EP0960349 - OPTICAL DEVICES AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.01.2005
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.01.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.03.2005  [2005/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AOFR Pty Limited
2 Faulding Street
Symonston, ACT 2609 / AU
[1999/48]
Inventor(s)01 / ELIAS, Martin, Charles
126 Scrivener Street
O'Connor, ACT 2601 / AU
02 / MADDEN, Stephen, John
9 Dettman Close
Isaacs, ACT 2609 / AU
[1999/48]
Representative(s)Pawlyn, Anthony Neil
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Arena Point
Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/48]Pawlyn, Anthony Neil
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, Tower House, Merrion Way
Leeds, West Yorkshire LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date98902853.513.02.1998
[1999/48]
WO1998AU00089
Priority number, dateAU1997PO0511614.02.1997         Original published format: AU PO511697
[1999/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9836302
Date:20.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0960349
Date:01.12.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.1998
[1999/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU20.08.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/293, H04J14/02
[1999/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/48]
TitleGerman:Optische Elemente und Verfahren[1999/48]
English:OPTICAL DEVICES AND METHODS[1999/48]
French:DISPOSITIFS ET PROCEDE OPTIQUES[1999/48]
Entry into regional phase10.09.1999National basic fee paid 
10.09.1999Search fee paid 
10.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
10.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
14.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
10.09.1999Examination requested  [1999/48]
31.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/10]
07.10.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0713110  (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [X] 72-74,80 * abstract * * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 50 *;
 [X]US5457760  (MIZRAHI VICTOR [US]) [X] 1,17,41,57 * abstract * * column 4 - column 7 *;
 [X]US5557439  (ALEXANDER STEPHEN B [US], et al) [X] 72-74,80 * abstract * * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 43 *;
 [X]EP0638837  (CSELT CENTRO STUDI LAB TELECOM [IT]) [X] 1,17,41,57 * abstract *
International search[A]JP07336324  ;
 [A]JP06244797  ;
 [A]JP06347836  ;
 [A]GB2295247  (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]);
 [A]EP0724314  (PIRELLI CAVI SPA [IT])
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 96, No. 4; & JP,A,07 336 324 (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP) 23 December 1995.,
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 18, No. 629; & JP,A,06 244 797 (FUJI ELECTROCHEM CO LTD) 2 September 1994.,
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 95, No. 3; & JP,A,06 347 836 (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH) 22 December 1994.,