Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968205

EP0968205 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF 2- (2-PYRIDINYL)METHYL SULFINYL -1H-BENZIMIDAZOLES AND NOVEL COMPOUNDS OF USE FOR SUCH PURPOSE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/01]PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF 2- (2-PYRIDINYL)METHYL]SULFINYL]-1H-BENZIMIDAZOLES AND NOVEL COMPOUNDS OF USE FOR SUCH PURPOSE
[2007/46]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.05.2002
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2007Change - German titlepublished on 14.11.2007  [2007/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
A/S GEA Farmaceutisk Fabrik
Holger Danskesvej 89
2000 Frederiksberg / DK
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / CLAUSEN, Finn, Priess
Delfinvej 14
DK-3450 Allerod / DK
02 / McCLUSKEY, Klaus, Karl
Sadelmagerporten 4
DK-2650 Hvidovre / DK
03 / PREIKSCHAT, Herbert, Fritz
Langkaergardsvej 22
DK-3460 Birkerod / DK
04 / PEDERSEN, Soren, Bols
Vesterkaersvej 7
DK-2650 Hvidovre / DK
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Bagger-Soerensen, Birgitte , et al
Internationalt Patent-Bureau A/S Rigensgade 11
1316 Copenhagen K / DK
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Bagger-Soerensen, Birgitte , et al
Internationalt Patent-Bureau, 23, Hoje Taastrup Boulevard
2630 Taastrup / DK
Application number, filing date98902961.616.02.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998DK00059
Priority number, dateDK1997000025007.03.1997         Original published format: DK 25097
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9840378
Date:17.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968205
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1998
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search reportEP17.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07D401/12, C07D235/28, C07D513/04
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   FI [2000/01]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 2- (2-PYRIDINYL)METHYL SULFINYL -1H-BENZIMIDAZOLEN UND DABEI VERWENDBARE NEUE VERBINDUNGEN[2007/46]
English:PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF 2- (2-PYRIDINYL)METHYL SULFINYL -1H-BENZIMIDAZOLES AND NOVEL COMPOUNDS OF USE FOR SUCH PURPOSE[2007/46]
French:PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE 2- 2-PYRIDINYL)METHYL SULFYNYL -1H-BENZIMIDAZOLES ET NOUVEAUX COMPOSES A UTILISER DANS LEDIT PROCEDE[2007/46]
Former [2000/01]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 2-[[(2-PYRIDINYL)METHYL]SULFINYL]-1H-BENZIMIDAZOLEN UND DABEI VERWENDBARE NEUE VERBINDUNGEN
Former [2000/01]PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF 2- (2-PYRIDINYL)METHYL]SULFINYL]-1H-BENZIMIDAZOLES AND NOVEL COMPOUNDS OF USE FOR SUCH PURPOSE
Former [2000/01]PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE 2- 2-PYRIDINYL)METHYL]SULFYNYL]-1H-BENZIMIDAZOLES ET NOUVEAUX COMPOSES A UTILISER DANS LEDIT PROCEDE
Entry into regional phase17.09.1999National basic fee paid 
17.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
17.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
27.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.01.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/29]
12.02.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
22.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0484265  (GENESIS PARA LA INVESTIGACION [ES], et al) [A] 1,11-19,24 * see the whole document; in particular page 24 - page 25, examples 9 and 10 *;
 [A]DD231787  (AKAD WISSENSCHAFTEN DDR [DD]) [A] 1,8-10,20 * the whole document *;
 [DA]  D. MARTIN ET AL., "Acylierung von Heterocyclen mit Kohlensäurederivaten-III", TETRAHEDRON, (INCL TETRAHEDRON REPORTS), OXFORD GB, (1983), vol. 39, no. 13, pages 2311 - 2314, XP002039564 [DA] 1-7,21-23 * see the whole document; in particular page 2311, scheme 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(01)91959-3
 [A]  H. KAGAMI ET AL., "Deoxygenation of Amine N-Oxides or C-Nitroso Compounds by Dialkyl Sulfoxylates", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, EASTON US, (19780317), vol. 43, no. 6, pages 1267 - 1268, XP002039565 [A] 1,11-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00400a061