Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968140

EP0968140 - METHOD FOR MAKING AN EXPANDED MATERIAL IN THE FORM OF GRANULES, FROM GLASS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.03.2002
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.05.2002  [2002/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cernix
6, rue Bobby-Lapointe
35235 Thorigne-Fouillard / FR
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / GARNIER, Corinne
30 rue des Saules
F-35340 Liffre / FR
02 / VERDIER, Patrick
La Percais
F-35690 Acigne / FR
03 / RAZAFINDRAKOTO, John
6, rue Bobby Lapointe
F-35235 Thorigne-Fouillard / FR
04 / LAURENT, Yves
Les Landes de Bille
F-35235 Thorigne-Fouillard / FR
[2000/14]
Former [2000/01]01 / GARNIER, Corinne
La Buzardière
F-35340 Liffre / FR
02 / VERDIER, Patrick
La Percais
F-35690 Acigne / FR
03 / RAZAFINDRAKOTO, John
6, rue Bobby Lapointe
F-35235 Thorigne-Fouillard / FR
04 / LAURENT, Yves
Les Landes de Bille
F-35235 Thorigne-Fouillard / FR
Representative(s)Ahner, Francis
Cabinet Regimbeau
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Ahner, Francis
CABINET REGIMBEAU 26, avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98903073.916.01.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998FR00077
Priority number, dateFR1997000046317.01.1997         Original published format: FR 9700463
[2000/01]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9831639
Date:23.07.1998
Language:FR
[1998/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968140
Date:05.01.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1998
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.07.1998
ClassificationInternational:C03B19/10, C03C11/00
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   NL [2000/01]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON EXPANDIERTEN KÜGELCHEN AUS GLAS[2000/01]
English:METHOD FOR MAKING AN EXPANDED MATERIAL IN THE FORM OF GRANULES, FROM GLASS[2000/01]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE MATERIAU EXPANSE SOUS FORME DE GRANULES, A PARTIR DE VERRE[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase09.08.1999National basic fee paid 
09.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
09.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
15.05.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.05.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.07.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.10.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/18]
27.11.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2002/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200104   M06   Fee paid on   23.07.2001
31.01.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0196949  (CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE(CNRS)) [A] 1,15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9535264  (CERNIX) [A] 1,15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0678482  (DENNERT PORAVER GMBH) [A] 1,15 * the whole document *