Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971664

EP0971664 - ABSORBENT ARTICLE WRAPPER COMPRISING A SIDE FLAP FASTENER COVER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.04.2003
Database last updated on 18.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.05.2003  [2003/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/23]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SHIMIZU, Yoshihisa
4-2-1-510, Kasuga
Suita City, Osaka 565 / JP
02 / HASEGAWA, Maki
3-14-3, Katayama-cho
Suita City, Osaka 564 / JP
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Veronese, Pancrazio , et al
Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A.
Centro Tecnico di Sambuceto
Via Aterno 128/130
Sambuceto
66020 San Giovanni Teatino (CH) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2001/31]Veronese, Pancrazio , et al
Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A. Italian Research Center Via Aterno 92/94
66020 Sambuceto di San Giovanni Teatino (Chieti) / IT
Former [2000/03]Hirsch, Uwe Thomas , et al
Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date98903232.127.02.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998IB00247
Priority number, dateWO1997US0537421.03.1997         Original published format: PCT/US97/05374
WO1997US0537521.03.1997         Original published format: PCT/US97/05375
[2002/12]
Former [2000/03]AL1974009705321.03.1997
AL1955097053721.03.1997
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9842285
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971664
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971664
Date:05.06.2002
Language:EN
[2002/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/15
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   NL,   SE [2001/27]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:VERPACKUNG FÜR ABSORBIERENDEN GEGENSTAND MIT ABDECKUNG DER WEITENLASCHENBEFESTIGUNG[2000/03]
English:ABSORBENT ARTICLE WRAPPER COMPRISING A SIDE FLAP FASTENER COVER[2000/03]
French:EMBALLAGE D'ARTICLE ABSORBANT COMPRENANT UNE COUVERTURE D'ELEMENT DE FIXATION DE RABAT LATERAL[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase27.09.1999National basic fee paid 
27.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
27.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
09.02.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.07.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.09.2001Fee for grant paid
07.09.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.03.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
05.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
04.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[DA]EP0750896  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [DA] 1,11 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9638110  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * abstract *;
 [A]GB2277914  (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1,11 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9404111  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1,11 * abstract *
by applicantJPH05293139
 JPH0678953
 JPH0626835
 JPH059526
 US5009529
 US6026833
 JPH0739820
 JPH0675446