Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1045673

EP1045673 - INTRAMEDULLARY SKELETAL DISTRACTOR AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  15.02.2003
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 02.04.2003  [2003/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Orthodyne, Inc.
Suite 204B, 1118 South Orange Avenue
Orlando, FL 32806 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/43]For all designated states
Orthodyne, Inc.
Suite 204B, 1118 South Orange Avenue
Orlando, FL 32806 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JUSTIN, Daniel, F.
185 North Winding Way
Logan, UT 84321 / US
[2000/43]
Representative(s)Goddard, Frances Anna
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/29]Goddard, Frances Anna
D Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Former [2000/43]Boden, Keith McMurray
D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date98903366.705.01.1998
[2000/43]
WO1998US00065
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9934746
Date:15.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1045673
Date:25.10.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.1999
[2000/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/72
[2000/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/43]
TitleGerman:INTRAMEDULLÄRER SKELETT-DESTRAKTOR UND VERFAHREN[2000/43]
English:INTRAMEDULLARY SKELETAL DISTRACTOR AND METHOD[2000/43]
French:EXTENSEUR INTRAMEDULLAIRE POUR DES OS ET TECHNIQUE D'UTILISATION[2000/43]
Entry into regional phase07.07.2000National basic fee paid 
07.07.2000Search fee paid 
07.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
07.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/43]
06.02.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
04.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]US5505733  (JUSTIN DANIEL F [US], et al)
by applicantUS5074882