Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0996627

EP0996627 - METHOD FOR SOLUTION PHASE SYNTHESIS OF OLIGONUCLEOTIDES AND PEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.04.2004
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.05.2004  [2004/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Proligo L.L.C.
2830 Wilderness Place
Boulder, CO 80301 / US
[2000/18]
Inventor(s)01 / PIEKEN, Wolfgang
4190 S. Hampton Circle
Boulder, CO 80301 / US
02 / GOLD, Larry
1033 5th Street
Boulder, CO 80302 / US
[2000/18]
Representative(s)Uexküll & Stolberg
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date98903457.406.01.1998
[2000/18]
WO1998US00562
Priority number, dateUS1997078051708.01.1997         Original published format: US 780517
[2000/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9830578
Date:16.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0996627
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.1998
[2000/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US16.07.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:C07K1/02, C07C229/02, C07H1/02, C07C271/22, C07H21/00
[2002/01]
Former International [2000/18]C07K1/02, C07C229/02, C07H1/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/18]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR FLÜSSIG PHASEN SYNTHESE VON OLIGONUKLEOTIDEN UND PEPTIDEN[2000/18]
English:METHOD FOR SOLUTION PHASE SYNTHESIS OF OLIGONUCLEOTIDES AND PEPTIDES[2000/18]
French:PROCEDE DE SYNTHESE EN PHASE SOLUTION D'OLIGONUCLEOTIDES ET DE PEPTIDES[2000/18]
Entry into regional phase21.07.1999National basic fee paid 
21.07.1999Search fee paid 
21.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
21.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/18]
03.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/21]
22.12.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]DE2334930  (PFAENDER PETER, et al) [X] 1,3,21,25 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [X]EP0309983  (KERNFORSCHUNGSANLAGE JUELICH [DE]) [X] 1-3,21,25 * claim 1 *;
 [X]WO9325571  (SIWRUK GARY A [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * figure 1; claims 1,8 *
International search[A]US5539082  (NIELSEN PETER E [DK], et al);
 [X]US3137684  (MIKLOS BODANSZKY);
 [X]US2871225  (BORTNICK NEWMAN M);
 [X]  - XIE X., CREIGHTON D. J., "SYNTHESIS AND INITIAL CHARACTERIZATION OF GAMMA-L-GLUTAMYL-L- THIOTHREONYL-GLYCINE AND GAMMA-L-GLUTAMYL-L-ALLO- THIOTHREONYGLYCIN AS STERIC PROBES OF THE ACTIVE SITE OF GLYOXALASEI.", Biochemical and Biophysical Research Communications, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, US, (19910531), vol. 177., no. 01., doi:10.1016/0006-291X(91)91975-I, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 252 - 258., XP002911136

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-291X(91)91975-I
 [X]  - Chemical Abstracts Service (C A S), (19000101), Database accession no. 112-235812, XP002911137
otherWO9220702