Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991371

EP0991371 - A METHOD FOR TREATING DENTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.02.2009
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.02.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.03.2009  [2009/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/15]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / EDWARDS, Mark, Ieuan
29 Claremont Avenue, Sunbury-Thames
Middx TW16 5LX / GB
02 / HUGHES, Iain, Allan
4 The Willows, Portmore Park Road
Surrey KT13 8EQ / GB
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Clemo, Nicholas Graham , et al
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited
Patent Department
Rusham Park
Whitehall Lane, Egham
Surrey TW20 9NW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Clemo, Nicholas Graham , et al
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Lovett House Lovett Road
Staines, Middlesex TW18 3AZ / GB
Application number, filing date98903489.714.01.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998US00700
Priority number, dateGB1997000084116.01.1997         Original published format: GB 9700841
GB1997002353405.11.1997         Original published format: GB 9723534
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9831298
Date:23.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0991371
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1998
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0991371
Date:09.04.2008
Language:EN
[2008/15]
Search report(s)International search reportUS23.07.1998
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP19.10.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61C17/00, A61K9/46, A61L2/16, B05C3/00, B05D1/18, B05D3/12
[2008/12]
Former International [2000/15]A61C17/00, A61K7/30, A61K9/46, A61L2/16, B05C3/00, B05D1/18, B05D3/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON GEBISS-PROTHESEN[2000/15]
English:A METHOD FOR TREATING DENTURES[2000/15]
French:PROCEDE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DES PROTHESES DENTAIRES[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase29.07.1999National basic fee paid 
29.07.1999Search fee paid 
29.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
29.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
29.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
06.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.2008Fee for grant paid
27.02.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.01.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
05.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
10.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
09.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
05.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
07.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
09.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
05.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
08.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE1909545  (KUKIDENT KURT KTISP KG) [Y] 1-17 * page 6, line 7 - line 15 * * claim - * * figure 1 *;
 [DY]WO9619563  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [DY] 1-17 * page 5, line 4 - page 6, line 5 * * example - * * claim - *
International search[Y]US4336816  (HORZ EBERHARD, et al);
 [Y]US4724855  (JACKSON ALBERT P [US], et al);
 [Y]US3793211  (KOHLHEPP F, et al);
 [Y]US5154915  (WEBER THOMAS R [US], et al);
 [Y]US5427770  (VICCARO JOHN P [US], et al);
 [A]US3787231  (LEBEL C, et al);
 [YP]US5665374  (HILL IRA D [US], et al)
by applicantWO9619563
 WO9619191
 WO9616630
 WO9619554
 US4136163
 US4230688