Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973693

EP0973693 - MULTICOMPONENT FEED APPARATUS WITH PREHEATER AND MIXER FOR A HIGH TEMPERATURE CHEMICAL REACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.02.2003
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.03.2003  [2003/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOLTEN METAL TECHNOLOGY, INC.
400-2 Totten Pond Road Waltham
Massachusetts 02154 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
MOLTEN METAL TECHNOLOGY, INC.
400-2 Totten Pond Road
Waltham, Massachusetts 02154 / US
Inventor(s)01 / STEPHENSON, Michael, J.
115 Concord Road
Oak Ridge, TN 37830 / US
02 / HAAS, Paul, A.
1205 Chickering Way
Knoxville, TN 37923 / US
03 / EVERITT, David, A.
115 Mocking Brid Lane
Oak Ridge, TN 37830 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Thomson, Paul Anthony , et al
Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead
Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Thomson, Paul Anthony , et al
Potts, Kerr & Co., 15, Hamilton Square
Birkenhead, Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB
Application number, filing date98903497.014.01.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998US00727
Priority number, dateUS1997078351214.01.1997         Original published format: US 783512
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9830500
Date:16.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973693
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.1998
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.07.1998
ClassificationInternational:C01G43/01, C01G43/025, B01J12/02, B01J19/26
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/04]
TitleGerman:MEHRKOMPONENTIGE SPEISEVORRICHTUNG MIT VORWÄRMER UND MISCHER FÜR CHEMISCHEN HOCHTEMPERATURREAKTOR[2002/03]
English:MULTICOMPONENT FEED APPARATUS WITH PREHEATER AND MIXER FOR A HIGH TEMPERATURE CHEMICAL REACTOR[2000/04]
French:APPAREIL D'ALIMENTATION A COMPOSANTS MULTIPLES DOTE D'UN PRECHAUFFEUR ET D'UN MELANGEUR POUR REACTEUR CHIMIQUE HAUTE TEMPERATURE[2000/04]
Former [2000/04]MEHRKOMPONENTIGE SPEISEVORRICHTUNG MIT VORWÄRMER UND MISCHER FÜR HOCHTEMPERATUR CHEMISCHE REAKTOR
Entry into regional phase13.08.1999National basic fee paid 
13.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
13.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
06.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
30.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/13]
14.10.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2003/13]
Request for further processing for:30.10.2001Request for further processing filed
30.10.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.11.2001Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200104   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2001
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0569765  (STARCK H C GMBH CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE2153310  (DU PONT) [A] 1-3 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]FR2160521  (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 3,4 * the whole document *;
 [PA]WO9745371  (M4 ENVIRONMENTAL L P [US]) [PA] 3-22 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2179031  (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *