Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0958273

EP0958273 - NOVEL ETHYLENICALLY UNSATURATED AMINE SALTS OF SULFONIC, PHOSPHORIC AND CARBOXYLIC ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 25.04.2007  [2007/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STEPAN COMPANY
22 West Frontage Road
Northfield, Illinois 60093 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/47]For all designated states
STEPAN COMPANY
22 West Frontage Road
Northfield, Illinois 60093 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SCHULTZ, Alfred, K.
319 Burnett Avenue
Lake Villa, IL 60046 / US
[1999/47]
Representative(s)Vossius, Volker , et al
ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/47]Vossius, Volker, Dr. , et al
Dr. Volker Vossius, Patentanwaltskanzlei - Rechtsanwaltskanzlei, Holbeinstrasse 5
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date98903595.128.01.1998
[1999/47]
WO1998US01065
Priority number, dateUS1997079036028.01.1997         Original published format: US 790360
[1999/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9832726
Date:30.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0958273
Date:24.11.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.1998
[1999/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0958273
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.07.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07C53/126, C07C233/47, C07C305/10, C07C309/04, C07C309/10, C07C309/15, C07C309/17, C07C309/31, C07C309/42, C07F9/09, C11D1/04, C11D1/12, C11D1/34
[1999/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/47]
Extension statesAL30.08.1999
LT30.08.1999
LV30.08.1999
MK30.08.1999
RO30.08.1999
SI30.08.1999
TitleGerman:ETHYLENISCH UNGESÄTTIGTE AMINSALZE VON SULFON-, PHOSPHOR- UND CARBONSÄUREN[1999/47]
English:NOVEL ETHYLENICALLY UNSATURATED AMINE SALTS OF SULFONIC, PHOSPHORIC AND CARBOXYLIC ACIDS[1999/47]
French:NOUVEAUX SELS AMINES INSATURES EN ETHYLENE, D'ACIDES SULFONIQUES, PHOSPHORIQUES ET CARBOXYLIQUES[1999/47]
Entry into regional phase30.08.1999National basic fee paid 
30.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
30.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.08.1999Examination requested  [1999/47]
21.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.2002Fee for grant paid
18.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.09.2002
FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
DK25.12.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
IE28.01.2003
LU28.01.2003
MC31.01.2003
[2007/17]
Former [2007/04]AT25.09.2002
FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
IE28.01.2003
LU28.01.2003
MC31.01.2003
Former [2005/21]AT25.09.2002
FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
LU28.01.2003
MC31.01.2003
Former [2005/02]AT25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
LU28.01.2003
MC31.01.2003
Former [2004/39]AT25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
LU28.01.2003
Former [2003/31]AT25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/30]GR25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/29]GR25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/20]GR25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
Former [2003/14]SE25.12.2002
Cited inInternational search[A]DE3426197  (AGFA GEVAERT AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 16 - page 22; claims 1,7 *;
 [DA]US5478883  (ANCHOR MICHAEL J [US], et al) [DA] 1 * column W *;
 [DA]US5162475  (TANG ROBERT H [US], et al) [DA] 1 * column W *;
 [DA]US4337185  (WESSLING RITCHIE A, et al) [DA] 1 * column W *;
 [DA]US4049608  (STECKLER ROBERT, et al) [DA] 1 * claim 1 *