Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968212

EP0968212 - METHOD OF MAKING (1S, 4R)-1-AZABICYCLO 2.2.1]HEPTAN-3-ONE AND (1R, 4S), 1-AZABICYCLO 2.2.1]HEPTAN-3-ONE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.02.2003
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.04.2003  [2003/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY
201 Tabor Road Morris Plains
New Jersey 07950 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/16]For all designated states
WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY
201 Tabor Road
Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY
201 Tabor Road
Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SOBIERAY, Denis, Martin
2178 South Bristol
Holland, MI 49424 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Tesch, Rudolf , et al
Warner-Lambert Company, Legal Division, Patent Department, c/o Gödecke AG, Mooswaldallee 1
79090 Freiburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Tesch, Rudolf, Dr. , et al
Warner-Lambert Company, Legal Division, Patent Department, c/o Gödecke AG, Mooswaldallee 1
79090 Freiburg / DE
Application number, filing date98903712.227.01.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998US01413
Priority number, dateUS19970036285P27.01.1997         Original published format: US 36285 P
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9832759
Date:30.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968212
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968212
Date:17.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.07.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07D487/08, // (C07D487/08, 209:00, 209:00)
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
Extension statesAL16.07.1999
LT16.07.1999
LV16.07.1999
MK16.07.1999
RO16.07.1999
SI16.07.1999
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON (1S,4R)-1-AZABICYCLO[2.2.1]HEPTAN-3-ON UND (1R,4S)-1-AZABICYCLO[2.2.1]HEPTAN-3-ON[2000/01]
English:METHOD OF MAKING (1S, 4R)-1-AZABICYCLO 2.2.1]HEPTAN-3-ONE AND (1R, 4S), 1-AZABICYCLO 2.2.1]HEPTAN-3-ONE[2000/01]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE (1S, 4R)-1-AZABICYCLO 2.2.1]HEPTAN-3-ONE ET DE (1R, 4S)-1-AZABICYCLO 2.2.1]HEPTAN-3-ONE[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase16.07.1999National basic fee paid 
16.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
22.05.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.11.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.02.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.11.2001Fee for grant paid
23.11.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.01.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[AD]  - J. BOELSTERLI ET AL., "Absolute configuration of 3-substituted 1-azabicyclo[2.2.1]heptanes", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA., BASEL CH, (1992), vol. 75, pages 507 - 512, XP002062480 [AD] 1 * see page 507, results and discussion and page 508, paragraphs 1 and 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.19920750210