Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971753

EP0971753 - BONDING LAYERS FOR MEDICAL DEVICE SURFACE COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.08.2006
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Angiotech BioCoatings, Corp.
336 Summit Point Drive
Henreitta, NY 14467 / US
For all designated states
Whitbourne, Richard J.
1 Gateway Road
Fairport, NY 14450 / US
[2005/10]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
STS Biopolymers, Inc.
336 Summit Point Drive
Henreitta, NY 14467 / US
For all designated states
Whitbourne, Richard J.
1 Gateway Road
Fairport, NY 14450 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WHITBOURNE, Richard, J.
336 Summil Point Drive
Henrietta, New-York 14467 / US
[2000/14]
Former [2000/03]01 / WHITBOURNE, Richard, J.
1 Gateway Road
Fairport, NY 14450 / US
Representative(s)Vaillant, Jeanne , et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S.
3, rue Auber
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Vaillant, Jeanne , et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud SA, 3, rue Chauveau-Lagarde
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98903753.627.01.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998US01531
Priority number, dateUS1997079144027.01.1997         Original published format: US 791440
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9832474
Date:30.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971753
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.1998
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971753
Date:19.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.07.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61L29/00, A61L31/00
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:VERBINDUNGSSCHICHTEN FÜR OBERFLÄCHENBESCHICHTUNGEN MEDIZINISCHER ARTIKEL[2000/03]
English:BONDING LAYERS FOR MEDICAL DEVICE SURFACE COATINGS[2000/03]
French:COUCHES DE LIAISON DESTINEES AU REVETEMENT DE LA SURFACE D'APPAREILS MEDICAUX[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase18.08.1999National basic fee paid 
18.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
18.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
18.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
05.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.07.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
25.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.03.2005Fee for grant paid
11.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.07.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/39]
Request for further processing for:25.09.2002Request for further processing filed
25.09.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.10.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
20.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.10.2005
BE19.10.2005
CH19.10.2005
FI19.10.2005
LI19.10.2005
DK19.01.2006
GR19.01.2006
SE19.01.2006
ES30.01.2006
LU31.01.2006
MC31.01.2006
PT20.03.2006
[2007/17]
Former [2006/50]AT19.10.2005
BE19.10.2005
CH19.10.2005
FI19.10.2005
LI19.10.2005
DK19.01.2006
GR19.01.2006
SE19.01.2006
ES30.01.2006
MC31.01.2006
PT20.03.2006
Former [2006/44]AT19.10.2005
BE19.10.2005
CH19.10.2005
FI19.10.2005
LI19.10.2005
DK19.01.2006
GR19.01.2006
SE19.01.2006
MC31.01.2006
PT20.03.2006
Former [2006/38]AT19.10.2005
BE19.10.2005
CH19.10.2005
FI19.10.2005
LI19.10.2005
DK19.01.2006
GR19.01.2006
SE19.01.2006
PT20.03.2006
Former [2006/36]AT19.10.2005
BE19.10.2005
CH19.10.2005
FI19.10.2005
LI19.10.2005
DK19.01.2006
SE19.01.2006
PT20.03.2006
Former [2006/34]AT19.10.2005
CH19.10.2005
FI19.10.2005
LI19.10.2005
DK19.01.2006
SE19.01.2006
PT20.03.2006
Former [2006/33]CH19.10.2005
FI19.10.2005
LI19.10.2005
SE19.01.2006
PT20.03.2006
Former [2006/27]FI19.10.2005
SE19.01.2006
PT20.03.2006
Former [2006/25]FI19.10.2005
PT20.03.2006
Former [2006/24]FI19.10.2005
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9213718  (STERILIZATION TECHN SERV) [X] 1-3,5,8-16,18,19,21-23 * page 2, line 24 - page 3, line 30 * * page 6, line 14 - line 17 * * page 7, line 4 - line 13 * * page 8, line 30 - page 9, line 19 *;
 [X]EP0379156  (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC) [X] 1-3,6-15,18,22,23 * page 4, line 1 - line 13 * * page 5, line 18 - line 26 * * page 5, line 56 - line 58 *;
 [PX]US5620738  (FAN YOU L ET AL) [PX] 1-3,5-15,18-20,22,23 * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 67 * * column 5, line 9 - column 6, line 53 *